Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3084988 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3084988



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 283
03.06.2019 Application deemed to be withdrawn ( translations of claims/payment missing from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
13.12.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
13.12.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
13.12.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
13.12.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 23
13.12.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 23
16.11.2018 Annex International Searching Authority 2
16.11.2018 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1
16.11.2018 Incoming letter related to ISA procedure International Searching Authority 1
16.11.2018 Incoming letter related to ISA procedure International Searching Authority 1
31.08.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
31.08.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
31.08.2018 Claims Search / examination 4
31.08.2018 Description Search / examination 4
31.08.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
31.08.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
16.07.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
16.07.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
23.03.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.03.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
23.03.2018 Claims Search / examination 4
23.03.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.03.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
21.12.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
21.12.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
15.12.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
25.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
25.01.2017 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
25.01.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 8
25.01.2017 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
25.01.2017 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
25.01.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
11.10.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
11.10.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
28.09.2016 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
19.09.2016 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
22.07.2016 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
20.07.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
20.07.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
20.07.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
05.07.2016 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
11.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
11.05.2016 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
11.05.2016 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
02.05.2016 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
03.08.2015 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 41
25.06.2015 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
25.06.2015 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 26
16.06.2015 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
16.06.2015 Annex International Searching Authority 3
16.06.2015 Claims International Searching Authority 6
16.06.2015 Description International Searching Authority 14
16.06.2015 Drawings International Searching Authority 5
01.04.2015 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
01.04.2015 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
01.04.2015 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
15.01.2015 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
15.01.2015 Annex International Searching Authority 3
15.01.2015 Claims International Searching Authority 6
15.01.2015 Description International Searching Authority 14
15.01.2015 Drawings International Searching Authority 5