Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3084988 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201480066881 EP14828598



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20160096192Global Dossier 12.08.2016A
Priority number Date
WO2014US70148 12.12.2014
US201314108174 16.12.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2017507614Global Dossier 16.03.2017A
Priority number Date
WO2014US70148 12.12.2014
US201314108174 16.12.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN105814815Global Dossier 27.07.2016A
Priority number Date
WO2014US70148 12.12.2014
US201314108174 16.12.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3084988Global Dossier 26.10.2016A1
Priority number Date
WO2014US70148 12.12.2014
US201314108174 16.12.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2015094986Global Dossier 25.06.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201314108174 16.12.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US2015311977Global Dossier 29.10.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201314108174 16.12.2013