Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3028418

EP3028418 - SYSTEM, APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING IMPROVED PERFORMANCE OF AGGREGATED/BONDED NETWORK CONNECTIONS BETWEEN REMOTE SITES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.12.2018
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.01.2019  [2019/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TELOIP INC.
5430 Timberlea Blvd., Unit 1
Mississauga, ON L4W 1T7 / CA
[2016/23]
Inventor(s)01 / SAAVEDRA, Patricio Humberto
1087 Kipling Avenue
Toronto, Ontario M9B 3M3 / CA
 [2016/23]
Representative(s)Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/23]Patel, Binesh
Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham West Midlands
B16 8QQ / GB
Application number, filing date14832123.531.07.2014
[2016/23]
WO2014CA00595
Priority number, dateUS20131395800902.08.2013         Original published format: US201313958009
[2016/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015013805
Date:05.02.2015
Language:EN
[2015/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3028418
Date:08.06.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2015
[2016/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CA05.02.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.04.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/64, H04L12/28
[2018/12]
Former International [2016/23]H04L12/803, H04L12/28
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/23]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM, VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR LEISTUNGSVERBESSERUNG VON AGGREGIERTEN/GEBUNDENEN NETZWERKVERBINDUNGEN ZWISCHEN ENTFERNTEN STANDORTEN[2016/23]
English:SYSTEM, APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING IMPROVED PERFORMANCE OF AGGREGATED/BONDED NETWORK CONNECTIONS BETWEEN REMOTE SITES[2016/23]
French:SYSTÈME, APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR ASSURER DES PERFORMANCES AMÉLIORÉES DE CONNEXIONS RÉSEAU AGRÉGÉES/LIÉES ENTRE SITES DISTANTS[2016/23]
Entry into regional phase29.01.2016National basic fee paid 
29.01.2016Search fee paid 
29.01.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
29.01.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.01.2016Examination requested  [2016/23]
16.11.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.03.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.07.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/03]
29.08.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2019/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
24.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201805   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US2006176900  (LIU BO [CA] ET AL) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0014]; figures 1, 2 * * claim 1 *;
 [A]US2002091795  (YIP MICHAEL [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0019]; figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]US2006098573  (BEER JOHN C [US] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-3; claim 1 *
 [A]  - KAMESWARI CHEBROLU ET AL, "Bandwidth Aggregation for Real-Time Applications in Heterogeneous Wireless Networks", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MOBILE COMPUTING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, US, (20060401), vol. 5, no. 4, ISSN 1536-1233, pages 388 - 403, XP001545978 [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002]; figures 1,2 *
International search[A]US7630412  (WRIGHT ET AL.);
 [A]US2006098573  (BEER ET AL.)
by applicantUS2006176900