Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3028872

EP3028872 - TIRE FOR TWO-WHEELED MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.11.2018
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.12.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 12.06.2019  [2019/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
[2016/23]
Inventor(s)01 / OSHIMA, Masatomo
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
Technical Center
3-1-1 Ogawahigashi-cho
Kodaira-shi Tokyo 187-8531 / JP
 [2016/23]
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/23]Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date14832144.123.06.2014
[2016/23]
WO2014JP03361
Priority number, dateJP2013015684229.07.2013         Original published format: JP 2013156842
[2016/23]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015015701
Date:05.02.2015
Language:JA
[2015/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3028872
Date:08.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3028872
Date:17.01.2018
Language:EN
[2018/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP05.02.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.09.2016
ClassificationInternational:B60C9/18, B60C9/20, B60C9/22, B60C9/02, B60C9/28, B60C11/00, B60C15/00
[2017/28]
Former International [2016/23]B60C9/18, B60C9/20, B60C9/22
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/23]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:REIFEN FÜR EIN ZWEIRÄDRIGES KRAFTFAHRZEUG[2016/23]
English:TIRE FOR TWO-WHEELED MOTOR VEHICLE[2016/23]
French:PNEUMATIQUE POUR VÉHICULE MOTORISÉ À DEUX ROUES[2016/23]
Entry into regional phase29.02.2016Translation filed 
29.02.2016National basic fee paid 
29.02.2016Search fee paid 
29.02.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
29.02.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.02.2016Examination requested  [2016/23]
24.03.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.07.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.12.2017Fee for grant paid
07.12.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.12.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)18.10.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL17.01.2018
AT17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
CZ17.01.2018
DK17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
IT17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
MC17.01.2018
NL17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RO17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
SI17.01.2018
SK17.01.2018
SM17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
GB23.06.2018
IE23.06.2018
LU23.06.2018
BE30.06.2018
CH30.06.2018
LI30.06.2018
[2019/24]
Former [2019/21]AL17.01.2018
AT17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
CZ17.01.2018
DK17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
IT17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
MC17.01.2018
NL17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RO17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
SI17.01.2018
SK17.01.2018
SM17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
GB23.06.2018
IE23.06.2018
LU23.06.2018
CH30.06.2018
LI30.06.2018
Former [2019/19]AL17.01.2018
AT17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
CZ17.01.2018
DK17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
IT17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
MC17.01.2018
NL17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RO17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
SI17.01.2018
SK17.01.2018
SM17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
IE23.06.2018
LU23.06.2018
Former [2019/17]AL17.01.2018
AT17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
CZ17.01.2018
DK17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
IT17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
MC17.01.2018
NL17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RO17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
SI17.01.2018
SK17.01.2018
SM17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
LU23.06.2018
Former [2019/15]AL17.01.2018
AT17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
CZ17.01.2018
DK17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
IT17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
MC17.01.2018
NL17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RO17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
SI17.01.2018
SK17.01.2018
SM17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2019/13]AL17.01.2018
AT17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
CZ17.01.2018
DK17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
IT17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
NL17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RO17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
SI17.01.2018
SK17.01.2018
SM17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/52]AL17.01.2018
AT17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
CZ17.01.2018
DK17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
IT17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
NL17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RO17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
SK17.01.2018
SM17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/51]AL17.01.2018
AT17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
CZ17.01.2018
DK17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
IT17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
NL17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RO17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
SK17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/50]AL17.01.2018
AT17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
CZ17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
IT17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
NL17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RO17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
SK17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/49]AL17.01.2018
AT17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
IT17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
NL17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RO17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/47]AL17.01.2018
AT17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
IT17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
NL17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/46]AL17.01.2018
AT17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
NL17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/40]AT17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
NL17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/39]AT17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
NL17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/37]CY17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
NL17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
Former [2018/36]CY17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
NL17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
NO17.04.2018
Former [2018/35]CY17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
NL17.01.2018
NO17.04.2018
Former [2018/34]FI17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
NL17.01.2018
NO17.04.2018
Documents cited:Search[A]JP2005535505  (SOCIETE DE TECHNOLOGIE MICHELIN) [A] 1-3 * abstract *;
 [A]WO2004018237  (MICHELIN SOC TECH [FR]; MICHELIN RECH TECH [CH]; VALLE ALAIN [FR]; PRO) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * page 14, line 21 - page 15, line 21 * * page 17, lines 15-24 *;
 [A]JP2013141884  (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND) [A] 2,3 * figures 1-4 *
International search[X]JP2007182098  (SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES, LTD.);
 [A]JP2005535505  (SOCIETE DE TECHNOLOGIE MICHELIN)
by applicantJP2010126005