Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3027790

EP3027790 - ELECTROCHEMICAL METHODS USING METAL OXIDATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2016/23]ELECTROCHEMICAL HYDROXIDE SYSTEMS AND METHODS USING METAL OXIDATION
[2018/33]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.11.2018
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.08.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.11.2018(Expected) grantpublished on 12.12.2018  [2018/50]
09.11.2018Change - applicantpublished on 12.12.2018  [2018/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Calera Corporation
7697 Highway One
Moss Landing, CA 95039 / US
[2018/50]
Former [2016/23]For all designated states
Calera Corporation
485 Alberto Way Suite 210
Los Gatos, CA 95032 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WEISS, Michael Joseph
200 Winchester Circle
Apartment C-221
Los Gatos, CA 95032 / US
02 / GILLIAM, Ryan J.
5018 New Trier Avenue
San Jose, CA 95136 / US
03 / SELF, Kyle
5326 Baron Drive
San Jose, CA 95124 / US
04 / MARIANSKY, Gal
900 West Edmundson
Morgan Hill, CA 95037 / US
05 / LECLERC, Margarete K.
1509 Montalto Drive
Mountain View, CA 94040 / US
06 / SHIPCHANDLER, Riyaz Mohammed
2261 Elkhorn Court
San Jose, CA 95125 / US
07 / NAGAR, Jacob
1010 Pacific Avenue
Apartment 413
Santa Cruz, CA 95060 / US
 [2016/23]
Representative(s)Patent Boutique LLP
10A Printing House Yard
Hackney Road
London E2 7PR / GB
[2018/50]
Former [2016/23]Patent Boutique LLP
37 Vanbrugh Park
London SE3 7AA / GB
Application number, filing date14832631.730.07.2014
[2016/23]
WO2014US48976
Priority number, dateUS201361860705P31.07.2013         Original published format: US 201361860705 P
US201461927167P14.01.2014         Original published format: US 201461927167 P
US201461952685P13.03.2014         Original published format: US 201461952685 P
[2016/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015017585
Date:05.02.2015
Language:EN
[2015/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3027790
Date:08.06.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2015
[2016/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3027790
Date:12.12.2018
Language:EN
[2018/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US05.02.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.12.2016
ClassificationInternational:C25B1/00, C25B1/26, C25B1/46, C25B3/02, C25B9/08, C07C17/02
[2018/33]
Former International [2017/02]C25B1/00, C25B1/26, C25B3/02, C25B9/08, C07C17/02
Former International [2016/23]C30B9/14, C25D3/56
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/23]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ELEKTROCHEMISCHE VERFAHREN MITTELS METALLOXIDIERUNG[2018/33]
English:ELECTROCHEMICAL METHODS USING METAL OXIDATION[2018/33]
French:PROCÉDÉS ÉLECTROCHIMIQUES FAISANT APPEL À L'OXYDATION MÉTALLIQUE[2018/33]
Former [2016/23]ELEKTROCHEMISCHE HYDROXIDSYSTEME UND VERFAHREN MITTELS METALLOXIDIERUNG
Former [2016/23]ELECTROCHEMICAL HYDROXIDE SYSTEMS AND METHODS USING METAL OXIDATION
Former [2016/23]SYSTÈMES D'HYDROXYDES ÉLECTROCHIMIQUES ET PROCÉDÉS FAISANT APPEL À L'OXYDATION MÉTALLIQUE
Entry into regional phase08.02.2016National basic fee paid 
08.02.2016Search fee paid 
08.02.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
08.02.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.02.2016Examination requested  [2016/23]
13.07.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.11.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.02.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.03.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
25.05.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.08.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.10.2018Fee for grant paid
25.10.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.10.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
27.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[I]US4376019  (GAMLEN PHILIP H [GB], et al) [I] 1-15 * examples 3, 8, 9, 11, 12, 14; claims 1, 3, 16 *
International search[X]US2012292197  (ALBRECHT THOMAS A [US], et al);
 [Y]US2006124445  (LABRECQUE RAYNALD [CA], et al);
 [A]WO2011116236  (BLACKLIGHT POWER INC [US], et al)
by applicantUS2012292197
 US4376019
 US9200375
 US4908198