Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3068801

EP3068801 - TUMOR NECROSIS FACTOR-LIKE LIGAND 1A SPECIFIC ANTIBODIES AND COMPOSITIONS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.06.2017
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip09.12.2019Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pfizer Inc.
235 East 42nd Street
New York, NY 10017 / US
For all designated states
Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Route 206 and Province Line Road
Princeton, NJ 08543-4000 / US
[2016/38]
Inventor(s)01 / ARCH, Robert
1615 Grant Road
St. Louis, MN 63119 / US
02 / ZHANG, Jun
A1-1-401
Building 1
5th Qu
Hepingli
Beijing 100013 / CN
03 / MADER, Michelle
7a Spring Road
Arlington, MA 02476 / US
04 / ISHINO, Tetsuya
2281-10 Gakuto Hikawadro
Izumo-shi
Shimane 699-0501 / JP
05 / BARD, Joel
6 Holland Street
Newton, MA 02458 / US
06 / FINLAY, William
23 Windsor Terrace
Portobello
Dublin 8 / IE
07 / CUNNINGHAM, Orla
3 Synge Court
Newtown Villas
Churchtown
Dublin 14 / IE
08 / REILLY, Ciara
68 Rafters Road
Drimnagh
Dublin 12 / IE
09 / BRAMS, Peter
2740 11th Avenue
Sacramento, CA 95815 / US
10 / DEVAUX, Brigitte
320 Duluth Circle
Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US
11 / HUANG, Haichun
2425 Sueno Way
Fremont, CA 94539 / US
12 / HENING, Karla
131 Curtis Avenue
Milpitas, CA 95035 / US
[N/P]
Former [2016/38]01 / ARCH, Robert
1615 Grant Road
St. Louis, MN 63119 / US
02 / ZHANG, Jun
A1-1-401
Building 1
5th Qu
Hepingli
Beijing 100013 / CN
03 / MADER, Michelle
7a Spring Road
Arlington, MA 02476 / US
04 / ISHINO, Tetsuya
145 Pinckney Street No. 506
Boston, MA 02114 / US
05 / BARD, Joel
6 Holland Street
Newton, MA 02458 / US
06 / FINLAY, William
23 Windsor Terrace
Portobello
Dublin 8 / IE
07 / CUNNINGHAM, Orla
3 Synge Court
Newtown Villas
Churchtown
Dublin 14 / IE
08 / REILLY, Ciara
68 Rafters Road
Drimnagh
Dublin 12 / IE
09 / BRAMS, Peter
2740 11th Avenue
Sacramento, CA 95815 / US
10 / DEVAUX, Brigitte
320 Duluth Circle
Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US
11 / HUANG, Haichun
2425 Sueno Way
Fremont, CA 94539 / US
12 / HENING, Karla
131 Curtis Avenue
Milpitas, CA 95035 / US
Representative(s)Gill Jennings & Every LLP
The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[2016/38]
Application number, filing date14833301.612.11.2014
[2016/38]
WO2014US65293
Priority number, dateUS201361903836P13.11.2013         Original published format: US 201361903836 P
US201361912374P05.12.2013         Original published format: US 201361912374 P
[2016/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015073580
Date:21.05.2015
Language:EN
[2015/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3068801
Date:21.09.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.05.2015
[2016/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.05.2015
ClassificationInternational:C07K16/28
[2016/38]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/38]
TitleGerman:TUMORNEKROSEFAKTORÄHNLICHE LIGAND-1A-SPEZIFISCHE ANTIKÖRPER SOWIE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN DAMIT UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON[2016/38]
English:TUMOR NECROSIS FACTOR-LIKE LIGAND 1A SPECIFIC ANTIBODIES AND COMPOSITIONS AND USES THEREOF[2016/38]
French:ANTICORPS SPÉCIFIQUES DU LIGAND 1A DE TYPE FACTEUR DE NÉCROSE TUMORALE ET COMPOSITIONS AINSI QU'UTILISATIONS ASSOCIÉES[2016/38]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase09.06.2016National basic fee paid 
09.06.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
09.06.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.06.2016Examination requested  [2016/38]
28.12.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.06.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
30.08.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.08.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
14.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
27.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[I]WO2013044298  (CEPHALON AUSTRALIA PTY LTD [AU]) [I] 1-27 * page page 8, line 18 - line 24; example all; tables 1,2 *;
 [I]WO2012161856  (US GOV HEALTH & HUMAN SERV [US], et al) [I] 1-27 * paragraph [0116]; example all *;
 [I]WO2012064682  (REGENERON PHARMA [US], et al) [I] 1-27 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0022]; claim all; tables 1-12 *;
 [I]WO2009064854  (COGENESYS INC [US], et al) [I] 1-27 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0038]; figure 1; example all *
by applicantUS4816567
 US5565332
 US5580717
 US5733743
 US6265150
 WO9306213
 US7314622
 WO8704462
 US5807715
 US6331415
 WO2004058184
 WO0009560
 US5047335
 US5510261
 US5278299
 WO9958572
 US5997867
 US5866692
 US5624821
 US5648260
 US5885573
 US6737056
 US7317091
 WO0042072
 WO2004029207
 WO2006105338
 WO2008022152
 WO2008150494
 WO2010033736
 US2004132101
 US2006024298
 US2006121032
 US2006235208
 US2007148170
 US4676980
 WO9100360
 WO9220373
 EP0003089
 WO9404690
 US4683195
 US4800159
 US4754065
 US4683202
 US6436908
 US6413942
 US6376471
 WO9007936
 WO9403622
 WO9325698
 WO9325234
 WO9311230
 WO9310218
 WO9102805
 US5219740
 US4777127
 GB2200651
 EP0345242
 WO9412649
 WO9303769
 WO9319191
 WO9428938
 WO9511984
 WO9500655
 US5814482
 WO9507994
 WO9617072
 WO9530763
 WO9742338
 WO9011092
 US5580859
 US5422120
 WO9513796
 WO9423697
 WO9114445
 EP0524968
 US6350466
 US6316024
 US6019968
 US5985320
 US5985309
 US5934272
 US5874064
 US5855913
 US5290540
 US4880078
 WO9219244
 WO9732572
 WO9744013
 WO9831346
 WO9966903
 US5679377
 US5916597
 US5912015
 US5989463
 US5128326
 WO9915154
 WO9920253
 US4526938
 WO9105548
 WO9620698
 US4522811
 US5374548
 US5399331
 US5416016
    - MIGONE ET AL., IMMUNITY, (2002), vol. 16, no. 3, pages 479 - 492
    - PREHN ET AL., CLIN. IMMUNOL., (2004), vol. 112, no. 1, pages 66 - 77
    - SHIH ET AL., EUR IMMUNOL, (2009), vol. 39, no. 11, pages 3239 - 3250
    - PAPADAKIS ET AL., J IMMUNOL, (2004), vol. 172, no. 11, pages 7002 - 7007
    - PAPADAKIS ET AL., J IMMUNOL, (2005), vol. 174, no. 8, pages 4985 - 4990
    - PAPPU ET AL., J EXP MED, (2008), vol. 205, no. 5, pages 1049 - 1062
    - TAKEDATSU ET AL., GASTROENTEROLOGY, (2008), vol. 135, no. 2, pages 552 - 567
    - MEYLAN ET AL., IMMUNITY, (2008), vol. 29, no. 1, pages 79 - 89
    - HSU; VINEY, MUCOSAL IMMUN., (2011), vol. 4, no. 4, pages 368 - 370
    - YAMAZAKI ET AL., HUM MOL GENET, (2005), vol. 14, no. 22, pages 3499 - 3506
    - BARRETT ET AL., NAT GENET, (2008), vol. 40, no. 8, pages 955 - 962
    - KAKUTA ET AL., HUM MOL GENET, (2009), vol. 18, no. 6, pages 1089 - 1098
    - JOSTINS ET AL., NATURE, (2012), vol. 491, no. 7422, pages 119 - 124
    - YAMAZAKI ET AL., GASTROENTEROLOGY, (2013), vol. 144, no. 4, pages 781 - 788
    - BAMIAS ET AL., J IMMUNOL, (2003), vol. 171, no. 9, pages 4868 - 4874
    - BAMIAS ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2006), vol. 103, no. 22, pages 8441 - 8446
    - KAMADA ET AL., INFLAMM BOWEL DIS, (2010), vol. 16, no. 4, pages 568 - 575
    - MEYLAN ET AL., IMMUNOL REV, (2011), vol. 244, no. 1, pages 188 - 196
    - TARABAN ET AL., MUCOSAL IMMUNOL, (2011), vol. 4, no. 2, pages 186 - 196
    - BAMIAS ET AL., DIG LIVER DIS., (2012), vol. 44, no. 1, pages 30 - 36
    - Methods in Molecular Biology, HUMANA PRESS
    - Methods in Enzymology, ACADEMIC PRESS, INC.
    - Handbook of Experimental Immunology
    - WARD ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 341, pages 544 - 546
    - BIRD ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 242, pages 423 - 426
    - HUSTON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 5879 - 5883
    - HOLLIGER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 6444 - 6448
    - POLJAK ET AL., STRUCTURE, (1994), vol. 2, pages 1121 - 1123
    - CHOTHIA; LESK, J. MOL. BIOL., (1987), vol. 196, no. 4, pages 901 - 917
    - JOHNSON; WU, NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (2000), vol. 28, pages 214 - 8
    - CHOTHIA ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1986), vol. 196, pages 901 - 17
    - CHOTHIA ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 342, pages 877 - 83
    - MARTIN ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI (USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 9268 - 9272
    - SAMUDRALA ET AL., "Ab Initio Protein Structure Prediction Using a Combined Hierarchical Approach", PROTEINS, STRUCTURE, FUNCTION AND GENETICS, (1999), vol. 3, pages 194 - 198, XP001146416
    - MACCALLUM ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1996), vol. 5, pages 732 - 45
    - MAKABE ET AL., JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (2008), vol. 283, pages 1156 - 1166
    - KOHLER; MILSTEIN, NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, page 495
    - MCCAFFERTY ET AL., NATURE, (1990), vol. 348, pages 552 - 554
    - DRAKE ET AL., ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (2004), vol. 328, pages 35 - 43
    - CACECI ET AL., BYTE, (1984), vol. 9, pages 340 - 362
    - WONG; LOHMAN, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 5428 - 5432
    - RAVETCH; KINET, ANN. REV. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 9, pages 457 - 92
    - CAPEL ET AL., IMMUNOMETHODS, (1994), vol. 4, pages 25 - 34
    - DE HAAS ET AL., J. LAB. CLIN. MED., (1995), vol. 126, pages 330 - 41
    - GUYER ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1976), vol. 117, page 587
    - KIM ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 24, page 249
    - WINTER ET AL., ANNU. REV. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 12, pages 433 - 455
    - MCCAFFERTY ET AL., NATURE, (1990), vol. 348, pages 552 - 553
    - JOHNSON, KEVIN S.; CHISWELL, DAVID J., CURRENT OPINION IN STRUCTURAL BIOLOGY, (1993), vol. 3, pages 564 - 571
    - CLACKSON ET AL., NATURE, (1991), vol. 352, pages 624 - 628
    - MARK ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 222, pages 581 - 597
    - GRIFFITH ET AL., EMBO J., (1993), vol. 12, pages 725 - 734
    - MARKS ET AL., BIO/TECHNOL., (1992), vol. 10, pages 779 - 783
    - WATERHOUSE ET AL., NUD. ACIDS RES., (1993), vol. 21, pages 2265 - 2266
    - KOHLER, B.; MILSTEIN, C., NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, pages 495 - 497
    - BUCK, D. W. ET AL., IN VITRO, (1982), vol. 18, pages 377 - 381
    - TILLER ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (2008), vol. 329, page 112
    - PEELERS ET AL., VACCINE, (2001), vol. 19, page 2756
    - LONBERG, N.; D. HUSZAR, INT. REV. IMMUNOL, (1995), vol. 13, page 65
    - POLLOCK ET AL., J IMMUNOL METHODS, (1999), vol. 231, page 147
    - MORRISON ET AL., PROC. NAT. ACAD. SCI., (1984), vol. 81, page 6851
    - MARKS ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 10, pages 779 - 783
    - BARBAS ET AL., PROC NAT. ACAD. SCI, USA, (1994), vol. 91, pages 3809 - 3813
    - SCHIER ET AL., GENE, (1995), vol. 169, pages 147 - 155
    - YELTON ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 155, pages 1994 - 2004
    - JACKSON ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 154, no. 7, pages 3310 - 9
    - HAWKINS ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1992), vol. 226, pages 889 - 896
    - BALINT ET AL., GENE, (1993), vol. 137, no. 1, pages 109 - 18
    - JEFFERIS; LUND, CHEM. IMMUNOL., (1997), vol. 65, pages 111 - 128
    - WRIGHT; MORRISON, TIBTECH, (1997), vol. 15, pages 26 - 32
    - BOYD ET AL., MOL. IMMUNOL., (1996), vol. 32, pages 1311 - 1318
    - WITTWE; HOWARD, BIOCHEM., (1990), vol. 29, pages 4175 - 4180
    - WYSS; WAGNER, CURRENT OPIN. BIOTECH., (1996), vol. 7, pages 409 - 416
    - UMANA ET AL., NATURE BIOTECH., (1999), vol. 17, pages 176 - 180
    - HSE ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1997), vol. 272, pages 9062 - 9070
    - MORGAN, IMMUNOLOGY, (1995), vol. 86, pages 319 - 324
    - LUND ET AL., J. IMMUNOLOGY, (1996), vol. 157, pages 4963 - 4969
    - IDUSOGIE ET AL., J. IMMUNOLOGY, (2000), vol. 164, pages 4178 - 4184
    - TAO ET AL., J. IMMUNOLOGY, (1989), vol. 143, pages 2595 - 2601
    - JEFFERIS ET AL., IMMUNOLOGICAL REVIEWS, (1998), vol. 163, pages 59 - 76
    - EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (1999), vol. 29, pages 2613 - 2624
    - EUR. J. LMMUNOL., (1999), vol. 29, pages 2613 - 2624
    - ARMOUR ET AL., MOLECULAR IMMUNOLOGY, (2003), vol. 40, pages 585 - 593
    - AALBERSE ET AL., IMMUNOLOGY, (2002), vol. 105, pages 9 - 19
    - PRESTA ET AL., BIOCHEM. SOC. TRANS., (2002), vol. 30, pages 487 - 490
    - STROHL, CURR. OPIN. BIOTECHNOL., (2009), vol. 20, no. 6, pages 685 - 691
    - ARMOUR ET AL., EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (1999), vol. 29, no. 8, pages 2613 - 2624
    - SHIELDS, J. BIOL. CHEM., (2001), vol. 276, no. 9, pages 6591 - 6604
    - IDUSOGIE ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2000), vol. 164, no. 8, pages 4178 - 4184
    - STEURER ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 155, no. 3, pages 1165 - 1174
    - IDUSOGIE ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2001), vol. 166, no. 4, pages 2571 - 2575
    - LAZAR ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2006), vol. 103, no. 11, pages 4005 - 4010
    - RYAN ET AL., MOL. CANCER. THER., (2007), vol. 6, pages 3009 - 3018
    - RICHARDS ET AL., MOL. CANCER THER, (2008), vol. 7, no. 8, pages 2517 - 2527
    - TOMLINSON ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1992), vol. 227, pages 776 - 798
    - COX ET AL., EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 24, pages 827 - 836
    - HUSTON ET AL., PROC. NAT . ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 5879 - 5883
    - HOLLIGER, P. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 6444 - 6448
    - POLJAK, R. J. ET AL., STRUCTURE, (1994), vol. 2, pages 1121 - 1123
    - III ET AL., PROTEIN ENG., (1997), vol. 10, pages 949 - 57
    - MARTIN ET AL., EMBO J., (1994), vol. 13, pages 5303 - 9
    - TRAUNECKER ET AL., EMBO J., (1991), vol. 10, pages 3655 - 3659
    - TRAUNECKER ET AL., INT. J. CANCER, (1992), vol. 7, pages 51 - 52
    - SURESH ET AL., METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1986), vol. 121, page 210
    - SONGSIVILAI; LACHMANN, CLIN. EXP. IMMUNOL., (1990), vol. 79, pages 315 - 321
    - KOSTELNY ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 148, pages 1547 - 1553
    - MILLSTEIN; CUELLO, NATURE, (1983), vol. 305, pages 537 - 539
    - "A model of evolutionary change in proteins - Matrices for detecting distant relationships", DAYHOFF, M.O., Atlas of Protein Sequence and Structure, NATIONAL BIOME ICAL RESEARCH FOUNDATION, (1978), vol. 5, pages 345 - 358
    - "Unified Approach to Alignment and Phylogenes", HEIN J., Methods in Enzymology, ACADEMIC PRESS, INC., (1990), vol. 183, pages 626 - 645
    - HIGGINS, D.G.; SHARP, P.M., CABIOS, (1989), vol. 5, pages 151 - 153
    - MYERS, E.W.; MULLER W., CABIOS, (1988), vol. 4, pages 11 - 17
    - ROBINSON, E.D., COMB. THEOR., (1971), vol. 11, page 105
    - SANTOU, N.; NES, M., MOL. BIOL. EVOL., (1987), vol. 4, pages 406 - 425
    - WILBUR, W.J.; LIPMAN, D.J., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1983), vol. 80, pages 726 - 730
    - FINDEIS ET AL., TRENDS BIOTECHNOL., (1993), vol. 11, page 202
    - WU ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1988), vol. 263, page 621
    - WU ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1994), vol. 269, page 542
    - ZENKE ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, page 3655
    - WU ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1991), vol. 266, page 338
    - JOLLY, CANCER GENE THERAPY, (1994), vol. 1, page 51
    - KIMURA, HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (1994), vol. 5, page 845
    - CONNELLY, HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (1995), vol. 1, page 185
    - KAPLITT, NATURE GENETICS, (1994), vol. 6, page 148
    - CURIEL, HUM. GENE THER., (1992), vol. 3, page 147
    - WU, J. BIOL. CHEM., (1989), vol. 264, page 16985
    - PHILIP, MOL. CELL BIOL., (1994), vol. 14, page 2411
    - WOFFENDIN, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1994), vol. 91, page 1581
    - "Medical Applications of Radioisotopes", CHASE ET AL., Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, MACK PUBLISHING CO., (1990), pages 624 - 652
    - "Clinical Use of Monoclonal Antibodies", BROWN ET AL., Biotechnology and Pharmacy, CHAPMAN AND HALL, (1993), pages 227 - 249
    - GROSSMAN, UROL. CLIN. NORTH AMER., (1986), vol. 13, pages 465 - 474
    - UNGER ET AL., INVEST. RADIOL., (1985), vol. 20, pages 693 - 700
    - KHAW ET AL., SCIENCE, (1980), vol. 209, pages 295 - 297
    - "Cell Marking Techniques and Their Application", PONDER, Mammalian Development: A Practical Approach, IRL PRESS, (1987), pages 115 - 138
    - THE UNITED STATES PHARMACOPEIAL CONVENTION, PHARMACOPEIAL FORUM, (2000), vol. 26, no. 1, page 223
    - BAERT ET AL., NEW ENGL. J. MED., (2003), vol. 348, pages 601 - 608
    - MILGROM ET AL., NEW ENGL. J. MED., (1999), vol. 341, pages 1966 - 1973
    - SLAMON ET AL., NEW ENGL. J. MED., (2001), vol. 344, pages 783 - 792
    - BENIAMINOVITZ ET AL., NEW ENGL. J. MED, (2000), vol. 342, pages 613 - 619
    - GHOSH ET AL., NEW ENGL. J. MED., (2003), vol. 348, pages 24 - 32
    - LIPSKY ET AL., NEW ENGL. J. MED., (2000), vol. 343, pages 1594 - 1602
    - YANG ET AL., NEW ENGL. J. MED., (2003), vol. 349, pages 427 - 434
    - HEROLD ET AL., NEW ENGL. J. MED., (2002), vol. 346, pages 1692 - 1698
    - LIU ET AL., J. NEUROL. NEUROSURG. PSYCH., (1999), vol. 67, pages 451 - 456
    - PORTIELJI ET AL., CANCER. IMMUNOL. IMMUNOTHER, (2003), vol. 52, pages 133 - 144
    - SIDMAN ET AL., BIOPOLYMERS, (1983), vol. 22, pages 547 - 556
    - LANGER ET AL., J. BIOMED. MATER. RES., (1981), vol. 15, pages 167 - 277
    - LANGER, CHEM. TECH., (1982), vol. 12, pages 98 - 105
    - EPSTEIN ET AL., PROC. NATI. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1985), vol. 82, pages 3688 - 3692
    - HWANG ET AL., PROC. NATI. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1980), vol. 77, pages 4030 - 4034
    - SEFTON, CRC CRIT. REF. BIOMED. ENG., (1987), vol. 14, page 20
    - BUCHWALD ET AL., SURGERY, (1980), vol. 88, page 501
    - SAUDEK ET AL., N. ENGL. J. MED., (1989), vol. 321, page 514
    - RANGER; PEPPAS, J., MACROMOL. SCL REV. MACROMOL. CHEM., (1983), vol. 23, page 61
    - LEVY ET AL., SCIENCE, (19841211), vol. 225, page 190
    - DURING ET AL., ANN. NEUROL., (1929), vol. 25, page 351
    - HOWARD ET AL., J. NEUROSUR, (1989), vol. 71, page 105
    - GOODSON, Medical Applications of Controlled Release, (1984), vol. 2, pages 115 - 138
    - LANGER, SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 249, pages 1527 - 1533
    - NING ET AL., "Intratumoral Radioimmunotheraphy of a Human Colon Cancer Xenograft Using a Sustained-Release Gel", RADIOTHERAPY AND ONCOLOGY, (1996), vol. 59, pages 179 - 189
    - SONG ET AL., "Antibody Mediated Lung Targeting of Long-Circulating Emulsions", PDA JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, (1995), vol. 50, pages 372 - 397
    - CLEEK, "Biodegradable Polymeric Carriers for a bFGF Antibody for Cardiovascular Application", PRO. MI. SYMP. CONTROL. REL. BIOACT. MATER., (1997), vol. 24, pages 853 - 854
    - LAM ET AL., "Microencapsulation of Recombinant Humanized Monoclonal Antibody for Local Delivery", PROC. MI. SYMP. CONTROL REL. BIOACT. MATER., (1997), vol. 24, pages 759 - 160
    - V.V. RANADE, J. CLIN. PHARMACAL., (1989), vol. 29, page 685
    - UMEZAWA ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., vol. 153, page 1038
    - P. G. BLOERNAN ET AL., FEBS LETT., (1995), vol. 357, page 140
    - M. OWAIS ET AL., ANTIMICROB. AGENTS CHEMOTHER., (1995), vol. 39, page 180
    - BRISCOE ET AL., AM. J. PHYSIOL., (1995), vol. 1233, page 134
    - SCHREIER ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1994), vol. 269, page 9090
    - K. KEINANEN; M.L. LAUKKANEN, FEBS LETT., (1994), vol. 346, page 123
    - KILLION; FIDLER, IMMUNOMETHODS, (1994), vol. 4, page 273
    - KATSAMBA ET AL., "Kinetic analysis of a high affinity antibody/antigen interaction performed by multiple Biacore users", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (20060515), vol. 352, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1016/j.ab.2006.01.034, pages 208 - 21, XP024942221

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ab.2006.01.034
    - FINLAY ET AL., J. MOL BIOL, (2009), vol. 388, no. 3, pages 541 - 58
    - STRAKE; RUPLEY, J MOL BIOL, (1973), vol. 79, no. 2, pages 351 - 71
    - KING ET AL., PROTEIN SCI., (2011), vol. 20, no. 9, pages 1546 - 1557
    - MEYLAN, F. ET AL., "The TNF-family receptor DR3 is essential for diverse T cell-mediated inflammatory diseases", IMMUNITY, (2008), vol. 29, pages 79 - 89
 WO1999GB01441