Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3062034

EP3062034 - OVERHEAD COMBUSTION HEATER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  29.07.2016
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.09.2017New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
UAB "Vakaro rasa"
Taikos g. 18
38102 Trakiskio k., Panevezio r. sav / LT
[2016/37]
Former [2016/35]For all designated states
Vaganov, Maksim Yurevich
Ul. Kollontay, 19-4, 60
St. Petersburg, 193231 / RU
For all designated states
Krasauskas, Valdas
Ul. Parko 47-44
Ponevezhis 37302 / LT
Inventor(s)01 / VAGANOV, Maksim Yurevich
ul. Kollontay, 19-4, 60
St.Petersburg, 193231 / RU
02 / KRAUSAUKAS, Valdas
ul. Parko 47-44
Ponevezhis, 37302 / RU
 [2016/37]
Former [2016/35]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Pranevicius, Gediminas , et al
Law firm IP Forma
Uzupio g. 30
01203 Vilnius / LT
[N/P]
Former [2016/35]Pranevicius, Gediminas
Law firm VARUL Konstitucijos pr. 7
09308 Vilnius / LT
Application number, filing date14834989.723.07.2014
[2016/35]
WO2014RU00543
Priority number, dateRU2013013704108.08.2013         Original published format: RU 2013137041
[2016/35]
Filing languageRU
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015020566
Date:12.02.2015
Language:RU
[2015/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3062034
Date:31.08.2016
Language:EN
[2016/35]
Search report(s)International search reportRU12.02.2015
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP20.03.2017
ClassificationInternational:F24H1/00, F23L1/00
[2016/35]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/35]
TitleGerman:OVERHEAD-VERBRENNUNGSERHITZER[2016/35]
English:OVERHEAD COMBUSTION HEATER[2016/35]
French:APPAREIL DE CHAUFFAGE À COMBUSTION SUPÉRIEURE[2016/35]
Entry into regional phase29.01.2016Translation filed 
01.02.2016National basic fee paid 
01.02.2016Search fee paid 
01.02.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
01.02.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.02.2016Examination requested  [2016/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201704   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO02086390  (STRUPAITIS EDMUNDAS [LT]) [Y] 1-4 * page 3, line 15 - line 21 * * page 4, line 19 - line 24 * * page 5, line 7 * * figure 1 *;
 [Y]UA89114  (EDMUNDAS SHTUPAITIS [LT]) [Y] 1-4 * abstract *;
 [Y]US4582024  (WILHELM FRANZ [DE]) [Y] 1-4 * column 4, line 40 - line 66; figure 1 *;
 [Y]US2013052094  (PLEY MARTIN [DE]) [Y] 1-4 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0148]; figure 3 *;
 [A]DE9413804U  (LIST GUENTHER ING [AT]) [A] 1 * page 3, paragraph 1; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]UA74485U  (STANCHEV VADYM HRYHOROVYCH [UA]) [A] 1-4 * abstract *;
 [A]NL111258C  (GERGES MONTOISY) [A] 1 * column 2, line 29 - line 50; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]CH222759  (BLANCHOUD PIERRE LEON [FR]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 63 - page 3, line 10; figures 3-5 *;
 [L]WO2015088467  (STANCHEV VADYM GRYGOROVYCH [UA]) [L] * the whole document *
International search[A]WO02086390  (STRUPAITIS EDMUNDAS [LT]);
 [A]RU2459145  (ILIODOROV VLADIMIR ALEKSANDROVICH [RU]);
 [A]RU121042U  (ZAKRYTOE AKTSIONERNOE OBSHCHESTVO «KALVIS»);
 [A]US4782765  (MILLER BILL R [US], et al)
by applicantUS4782765