blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3062034 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3062034



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 102
21.03.2018 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
14.03.2018 Final instructions (application deemed to be withdrawn/application refused) Search / examination 1
24.11.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no declaration of maintenance of the application/non-reply to the Written Opinion) Search / examination 2
04.09.2017 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
06.04.2017 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
20.03.2017 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
20.03.2017 European search opinion Search / examination 4
20.03.2017 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
20.03.2017 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 3
31.10.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
07.10.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
16.08.2016 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
03.08.2016 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
30.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
30.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
30.05.2016 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 1
30.05.2016 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
30.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
30.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
30.05.2016 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
30.05.2016 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
30.05.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
30.05.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
30.05.2016 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 1
07.04.2016 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
06.04.2016 Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them Search / examination 2
22.02.2016 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 4
22.02.2016 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
06.02.2016 General authorisation Search / examination 1
06.02.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
29.01.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
29.01.2016 Abstract Search / examination 1
29.01.2016 Claims Search / examination 2
29.01.2016 Description Search / examination 6
29.01.2016 Drawings Search / examination 4
29.01.2016 General authorisation Search / examination 1
29.01.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
29.01.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
29.01.2016 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
16.12.2015 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
10.12.2015 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
05.03.2015 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 12
12.02.2015 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
12.02.2015 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 1
12.02.2015 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 11