blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3062034


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
16.03.2018 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  18.04.2018  [2018/16]
24.11.2017 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
05.09.2017 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
21.03.2017 Supplementary search report published on  19.04.2017  [2017/16]
20.03.2017 Change - classification published on  19.04.2017  [2017/16]
20.03.2017 Change - classification published on  19.04.2017  [2017/16]
26.10.2016 Change - representative
14.10.2016 Change - extension states published on  16.11.2016  [2016/46]
12.08.2016 Change - applicant published on  14.09.2016  [2016/37]
12.08.2016 Change - inventor published on  14.09.2016  [2016/37]
29.07.2016 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  31.08.2016  [2016/35]
29.07.2016 Request for examination filed published on  31.08.2016  [2016/35]
03.06.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.03.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
12.02.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
09.02.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
30.01.2016 Change - representative
30.01.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
19.02.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
13.02.2015 PCT data prior to European publication