blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3062034
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3062034Global Dossier 19.04.2017A4
EP3062034 31.08.2016A1
Priority number Date
RU2013137041 08.08.2013
WO2014RU00543 23.07.2014
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2015020566Global Dossier 12.02.2015A1
Priority number Date
RU2013137041 08.08.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
RU2525755 20.08.2014C1
Priority number Date
RU2013137041 08.08.2013