blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP3062034

Designated contracting statesAL 
AT 
BE 
BG 
CH 
CY 
CZ 
DE 
DK 
EE 
ES 
FI 
FR 
GB 
GR 
HR 
HU 
IE 
IS 
IT 
LI 
LT 
LU 
LV 
MC 
MK 
MT 
NL 
NO 
PL 
PT 
RO 
RS 
SE 
SI 
SK 
SM 
TR 
Examination procedure24.11.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/16]
Entry into regional phase29.01.2016Translation filed 
01.02.2016National basic fee paid 
01.02.2016Search fee paid 
01.02.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
01.02.2016Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201704   M06   Not yet paid
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:31.08.2016 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20160201
 
Event date:31.08.2016 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:31.08.2016 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:BA ME
 
Event date:14.09.2016 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:VAGANOV, MAKSIM YUREVICH
 
Event date:14.09.2016 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:UAB "VAKARO RASA"
 
Event date:14.09.2016 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:KRAUSAUKAS, VALDAS
 
Event date:16.11.2016 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)
 
Event date:19.04.2017 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:F23L 1/00 20060101ALI20170314BHEP
 
Event date:19.04.2017 
Event description:SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20170320
 
Event date:19.04.2017 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:F24H 1/00 20060101AFI20170314BHEP
 
Event date:18.04.2018 
Event description:APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20171017