Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3031141

EP3031141 - CANCELLATION OF NON-LINEAR DIGITAL SELF-INTERFERENCES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2016/24]SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR NON-LINEAR DIGITAL SELF-INTERFERENCE CANCELLATION
[2017/48]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.12.2018
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.01.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  13.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kumu Networks, Inc.
960 Hamlin Court
Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US
[2018/12]
Former [2016/24]For all designated states
Kumu Networks, Inc.
3265 Kifer Road
Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CHOI, Jung-Il
3265 Kifer Road
Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US
02 / JAIN, Mayank
3265 Kifer Road
Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US
03 / MEHLMAN, Jeff
3265 Kifer Road
Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US
04 / HONG, Steven
3265 Kifer Road
Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US
 [2016/24]
Representative(s)Higgs, Jonathan , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Altius House
1 North Fourth Street
Milton Keynes MK9 1DG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/07]Stanners, David Ralph
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Altius House
1 North Fourth Street
Milton Keynes MK9 1NE / GB
Former [2016/24]Stanners, David Ralph
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP The Podium
1 Eversholt Street
London NW1 2DN / GB
Application number, filing date14835113.311.08.2014
[2016/24]
WO2014US50517
Priority number, dateUS201361864453P09.08.2013         Original published format: US 201361864453 P
[2016/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015021461
Date:12.02.2015
Language:EN
[2015/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3031141
Date:15.06.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.2015
[2016/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3031141
Date:14.02.2018
Language:EN
[2018/07]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP3031141
Date:16.05.2018
[2018/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US12.02.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.02.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04L5/14
[2017/12]
Former International [2016/24]H04B1/44
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/24]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:UNTERDRÜCKUNG NICHTLINEARER DIGITALER SELBSTINTERFERENZEN[2017/48]
English:CANCELLATION OF NON-LINEAR DIGITAL SELF-INTERFERENCES[2017/48]
French:ANNULATION D'AUTOBROUILLAGE NUMÉRIQUE NON LINÉAIRE[2017/48]
Former [2016/24]SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR UNTERDRÜCKUNG NICHTLINEARER DIGITALER SELBSTINTERFERENZEN
Former [2016/24]SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR NON-LINEAR DIGITAL SELF-INTERFERENCE CANCELLATION
Former [2016/24]SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS D'ANNULATION D'AUTOBROUILLAGE NUMÉRIQUE NON LINÉAIRE
Entry into regional phase26.01.2016National basic fee paid 
26.01.2016Search fee paid 
26.01.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
26.01.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.01.2016Examination requested  [2016/24]
12.09.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.11.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.12.2017Fee for grant paid
12.12.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.12.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)15.11.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2019/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
12.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL14.02.2018
AT14.02.2018
CY14.02.2018
CZ14.02.2018
DK14.02.2018
EE14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
IT14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
LV14.02.2018
MC14.02.2018
PL14.02.2018
RO14.02.2018
RS14.02.2018
SI14.02.2018
SK14.02.2018
SM14.02.2018
BG14.05.2018
NO14.05.2018
GR15.05.2018
LU11.08.2018
MT11.08.2018
BE31.08.2018
CH31.08.2018
LI31.08.2018
[2020/08]
Former [2019/38]AL14.02.2018
AT14.02.2018
CY14.02.2018
CZ14.02.2018
DK14.02.2018
EE14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
IT14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
LV14.02.2018
MC14.02.2018
PL14.02.2018
RO14.02.2018
RS14.02.2018
SI14.02.2018
SK14.02.2018
SM14.02.2018
BG14.05.2018
NO14.05.2018
GR15.05.2018
LU11.08.2018
BE31.08.2018
CH31.08.2018
LI31.08.2018
Former [2019/21]AL14.02.2018
AT14.02.2018
CY14.02.2018
CZ14.02.2018
DK14.02.2018
EE14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
IT14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
LV14.02.2018
MC14.02.2018
PL14.02.2018
RO14.02.2018
RS14.02.2018
SI14.02.2018
SK14.02.2018
SM14.02.2018
BG14.05.2018
NO14.05.2018
GR15.05.2018
LU11.08.2018
CH31.08.2018
LI31.08.2018
Former [2019/15]AL14.02.2018
AT14.02.2018
CY14.02.2018
CZ14.02.2018
DK14.02.2018
EE14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
IT14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
LV14.02.2018
MC14.02.2018
PL14.02.2018
RO14.02.2018
RS14.02.2018
SI14.02.2018
SK14.02.2018
SM14.02.2018
BG14.05.2018
NO14.05.2018
GR15.05.2018
Former [2019/13]AL14.02.2018
AT14.02.2018
CY14.02.2018
CZ14.02.2018
DK14.02.2018
EE14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
IT14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
LV14.02.2018
PL14.02.2018
RO14.02.2018
RS14.02.2018
SI14.02.2018
SK14.02.2018
SM14.02.2018
BG14.05.2018
NO14.05.2018
GR15.05.2018
Former [2018/52]AL14.02.2018
AT14.02.2018
CY14.02.2018
CZ14.02.2018
DK14.02.2018
EE14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
IT14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
LV14.02.2018
PL14.02.2018
RO14.02.2018
RS14.02.2018
SK14.02.2018
SM14.02.2018
BG14.05.2018
NO14.05.2018
GR15.05.2018
Former [2018/51]AL14.02.2018
AT14.02.2018
CY14.02.2018
CZ14.02.2018
DK14.02.2018
EE14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
IT14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
LV14.02.2018
PL14.02.2018
RO14.02.2018
RS14.02.2018
SK14.02.2018
BG14.05.2018
NO14.05.2018
GR15.05.2018
Former [2018/50]AL14.02.2018
AT14.02.2018
CY14.02.2018
CZ14.02.2018
EE14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
IT14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
LV14.02.2018
PL14.02.2018
RO14.02.2018
RS14.02.2018
SK14.02.2018
BG14.05.2018
NO14.05.2018
GR15.05.2018
Former [2018/47]AL14.02.2018
AT14.02.2018
CY14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
IT14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
LV14.02.2018
RS14.02.2018
BG14.05.2018
NO14.05.2018
GR15.05.2018
Former [2018/46]AL14.02.2018
AT14.02.2018
CY14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
LV14.02.2018
RS14.02.2018
BG14.05.2018
NO14.05.2018
GR15.05.2018
Former [2018/40]AT14.02.2018
CY14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
LV14.02.2018
RS14.02.2018
BG14.05.2018
NO14.05.2018
GR15.05.2018
Former [2018/39]AT14.02.2018
CY14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
LV14.02.2018
RS14.02.2018
NO14.05.2018
GR15.05.2018
Former [2018/37]CY14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
NO14.05.2018
GR15.05.2018
Former [2018/36]CY14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
NO14.05.2018
Former [2018/35]CY14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
NO14.05.2018
Documents cited:Search[A]  - TANELI RIIHONEN ET AL, "Mitigation of Loopback Self-Interference in Full-Duplex MIMO Relays", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SIGNAL PROCESSING, US, (20111201), vol. 59, no. 12, doi:10.1109/TSP.2011.2164910, ISSN 1053-587X, pages 5983 - 5993, XP011378314 [A] 1-14 * abstract * * Sections I-V *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TSP.2011.2164910
 [A]  - SHENGHONG LI ET AL, "Full-Duplex Wireless Communication Using Transmitter Output Based Echo Cancellation", IEEE GLOBECOM 2011, (20111205), doi:10.1109/GLOCOM.2011.6133971, ISBN 978-1-4244-9266-4, pages 1 - 5, XP032119170 [A] 1-14 * abstract * * Sections I-V *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/GLOCOM.2011.6133971
 [A]  - YINGBO HUA ET AL, "A Method for Broadband Full-Duplex MIMO Radio", IEEE SIGNAL PROCESSING LETTERS, US, (20121201), vol. 19, no. 12, doi:10.1109/LSP.2012.2221710, ISSN 1070-9908, pages 793 - 796, XP011472178 [A] 1-14 * abstract * * Sections I-V *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/LSP.2012.2221710
International search[X]US2013044791  (RIMINI ET AL.);
 [Y]US2007018722  (JAENECKE);
 [A]US2013155913  (SARCA);
 [A]US2011149714  (RIMINI ET AL.);
 [A]US2013166259  (WEBER ET AL.)