Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3036488

EP3036488 - REFRIGERATOR COOLER WITH MAGNETIC FRENCH DOOR GASKETS AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.03.2018
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  19.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.03.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.04.2018  [2018/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
True Manufacturing Co., Inc.
2001 E. Terra Lane
O'Fallon, Missouri 63366 / US
[2016/26]
Inventor(s)01 / TRULASKE, Steven L., Sr.
44 Glen Eagles Drive
St. Louis, Missouri 63124 / US
 [2016/26]
Representative(s)Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen
WP Thompson
138 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BT / GB
[2016/26]
Application number, filing date14837945.621.08.2014
[2016/26]
WO2014US52011
Priority number, dateUS20131397235321.08.2013         Original published format: US201313972353
[2016/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015027019
Date:26.02.2015
Language:EN
[2015/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3036488
Date:29.06.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.2015
[2016/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR26.02.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.03.2017
ClassificationInternational:F25D23/00, F25D23/02, F25D23/06
[2016/26]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/26]
TitleGerman:KÜHLSCHRANK MIT MAGNETISCHEN FRENCH-DOOR-DICHTUNGEN SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG[2016/26]
English:REFRIGERATOR COOLER WITH MAGNETIC FRENCH DOOR GASKETS AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURE[2016/26]
French:REFROIDISSEUR DE RÉFRIGÉRATEUR AYANT DES JOINTS MAGNÉTIQUES DE PORTE-FENÊTRE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION[2016/26]
Entry into regional phase23.02.2016National basic fee paid 
23.02.2016Search fee paid 
23.02.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
23.02.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.02.2016Examination requested  [2016/26]
03.10.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/16]
20.11.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201704   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]US5816080  (JEZIOROWSKI LES A [CA]) [X] 1-5,12 * column 4, line 52 - column 7, line 62; figures 1-7 * [I] 6-11,13-15;
 [A]EP0878676  (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 16 * the whole document *
International search[X]US5816080  (JEZIOROWSKI LES A [CA]);
 [A]US7823331  (LINKMEYER GREGORY R [US], et al);
 [A]US5975664  (BANICEVIC NEDO [CA], et al);
 [A]KR100707450B  (LG ELECTRONICS INC.);
 [A]KR20060094818  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR])