Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3038050

EP3038050 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR RESTORING SCAN IMAGE AND RECORDING MEDIUM FOR STORING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.05.2016
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.08.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vatech Co. Ltd.
13
2-gil Samseong 1-ro
Hwaseong-si
Gyeonggi-do 445-170 / KR
For all designated states
Vatech Ewoo Holdings Co., Ltd
14 Samsung 1-ro 1-gil
Hwaseong-si
Gyeonggi-do 445-170 / KR
[2016/26]
Inventor(s)01 / CHOI, Sung Il
13 Samsung 1-ro 2-gil
Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 445-170 / KR
 [2016/26]
Representative(s)Markfort, Iris-Anne Lucie
Lorenz & Kollegen
Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Alte Ulmer Straße 2
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[2016/26]
Application number, filing date14838311.020.08.2014
[2016/26]
WO2014KR07740
Priority number, dateKR2013009831120.08.2013         Original published format: KR 20130098311
[2016/26]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015026164
Date:26.02.2015
Language:KO
[2015/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3038050
Date:29.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR26.02.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.05.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06T11/00, G06T5/00, A61B6/03
[2017/24]
Former International [2016/26]G06T5/00, A61B6/03
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/26]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR WIEDERHERSTELLUNG EINES SCANBILDES UND AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM ZUR SPEICHERUNG DAFÜR[2016/26]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR RESTORING SCAN IMAGE AND RECORDING MEDIUM FOR STORING SAME[2016/26]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE RÉTABLISSEMENT D'UNE IMAGE DE BALAYAGE ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT POUR LA CONSERVER[2016/26]
Entry into regional phase11.03.2016Translation filed 
11.03.2016National basic fee paid 
11.03.2016Search fee paid 
11.03.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
11.03.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.03.2016Examination requested  [2016/26]
11.12.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
28.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
23.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XI]  - FUJITA H ET AL, "A SIMPLE METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE MODULATION TRANSFER FUNCTION IN DIGITAL RADIOGRAPHY", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MEDICAL IMAGING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (19920301), vol. 11, no. 1, doi:10.1109/42.126908, ISSN 0278-0062, pages 34 - 39, XP009083008 [X] 1-8,11,12 * abstract * * section "II.A. Determining of the Presampling MTF" * [I] 9,10

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/42.126908
 [X]  - PONCHUT C ET AL, "Experimental comparison of pixel detector arrays and CCD-based systems for X-ray area detection on synchrotron beamlines", 2004 IEEE NUCLEAR SCIENCE SYMPOSIUM CONFERENCE RECORD 16-22 OCT. 2004 ROME, ITALY, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20041016), vol. 7, doi:10.1109/NSSMIC.2004.1466922, ISBN 978-0-7803-8700-3, pages 4676 - 4680, XP010819730 [X] 1-8,11,12 * abstract * * sections "III.C. LSF, dynamic range", "III.D. MTF" *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/NSSMIC.2004.1466922
 [X]  - SONKE JAN-JAKOB ET AL, "Focal spot motion of linear accelerators and its effect on portal image analysis", MEDICAL PHYSICS, AIP, MELVILLE, NY, US, (20030601), vol. 30, no. 6, doi:10.1118/1.1576229, ISSN 0094-2405, pages 1067 - 1075, XP012012099 [X] 1,3,11 * abstract * * page 1067, column r, lines 3-24 * * sections "II.C. Experimental setup", "II.D. Signal analysis" *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1118/1.1576229
International search[A]EP1492050  (CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA);
 [A]WO2008050320  (BEN GURION UNIVERSITY OF THE NEGEV, RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT AUTHORITY);
 [A]US2009067742  (LIM, JAE-GUYN ET AL.)
 [A]  - LEE, SO YOUNG ET AL., "Image Restoration Simulation of Digital X-ray Images Based upon Filtering Techniques and the Quality Evaluation of the Restored Images", JOURNAL OF THE KOREAN SOCIETY OF RADIOLOGY, vol. 2, no. 4, (2008), pages 33 - 40, URL: http://scholar.ndsl.kr/ schArticleDetail.do?cn=JAKO200823736031020, XP055319836
 [A]  - AKIHIRO KAYUGAWA ET AL., "Accurate determination of CT point-spread-function with high precision", JOURNAL OF APPLIED CLINICAL MEDICAL PHYSICS, vol. 14, no. 4, (20130127), URL: http://www.jacmp.org/index.php/jacmp/article/viewFile93905/2941, XP055320973

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1120/jacmp.v14i4.3905