Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3040739

EP3040739 - NEUTRON SCINTILLATOR AND NEUTRON DETECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.05.2019
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.06.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE, FR
published on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tokuyama Corporation
1-1, Mikage-cho
Shunan-shi, Yamaguchi 745-8648 / JP
[2016/27]
Inventor(s)01 / FUKUDA, Kentaro
c/o Tokuyama Corporation
1-1 Mikage-cho
Shunan-shi Yamaguchi 745-8648 / JP
02 / ISHIZU, Sumito
c/o Tokuyama Corporation
1-1 Mikage-cho
Shunan-shi Yamaguchi 745-8648 / JP
03 / SAITO, Hiroaki
c/o Tokuyama Corporation
1-1 Mikage-cho
Shunan-shi Yamaguchi 745-8648 / JP
 [2016/27]
Representative(s)Markfort, Iris-Anne Lucie
Lorenz & Kollegen
Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Alte Ulmer Straße 2
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[2016/27]
Application number, filing date14840072.428.08.2014
[2016/27]
WO2014JP04428
Priority number, dateJP2013017895630.08.2013         Original published format: JP 2013178956
[2016/27]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015029439
Date:05.03.2015
Language:JA
[2015/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3040739
Date:06.07.2016
Language:EN
[2016/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3040739
Date:18.07.2018
Language:EN
[2018/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP05.03.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.05.2017
ClassificationInternational:G01T3/06, C09K11/64, G21K4/00, C09K11/02
[2017/23]
Former International [2016/27]G01T3/06, C09K11/00, C09K11/06, C09K11/64, C09K11/85
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/27]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:NEUTRONENSZINTILLATOR UND NEUTRONENDETEKTOR[2016/27]
English:NEUTRON SCINTILLATOR AND NEUTRON DETECTOR[2016/27]
French:SCINTILLATEUR À NEUTRONS ET DÉTECTEUR DE NEUTRONS[2016/27]
Entry into regional phase22.02.2016Translation filed 
22.02.2016National basic fee paid 
22.02.2016Search fee paid 
22.02.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
22.02.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.02.2016Examination requested  [2016/27]
27.11.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.02.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.06.2018Fee for grant paid
08.06.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.06.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)23.04.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
28.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL18.07.2018
AT18.07.2018
CZ18.07.2018
DK18.07.2018
EE18.07.2018
ES18.07.2018
FI18.07.2018
HR18.07.2018
IT18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
LV18.07.2018
MC18.07.2018
NL18.07.2018
PL18.07.2018
RO18.07.2018
RS18.07.2018
SI18.07.2018
SK18.07.2018
SM18.07.2018
LU28.08.2018
BE31.08.2018
CH31.08.2018
LI31.08.2018
FR18.09.2018
BG18.10.2018
NO18.10.2018
GR19.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
[2019/38]
Former [2019/37]AL18.07.2018
AT18.07.2018
CZ18.07.2018
DK18.07.2018
EE18.07.2018
ES18.07.2018
FI18.07.2018
HR18.07.2018
IT18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
LV18.07.2018
MC18.07.2018
NL18.07.2018
PL18.07.2018
RO18.07.2018
RS18.07.2018
SI18.07.2018
SK18.07.2018
SM18.07.2018
LU28.08.2018
CH31.08.2018
LI31.08.2018
BG18.10.2018
NO18.10.2018
GR19.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
Former [2019/26]AL18.07.2018
AT18.07.2018
CZ18.07.2018
DK18.07.2018
EE18.07.2018
ES18.07.2018
FI18.07.2018
HR18.07.2018
IT18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
LV18.07.2018
MC18.07.2018
NL18.07.2018
PL18.07.2018
RO18.07.2018
RS18.07.2018
SK18.07.2018
SM18.07.2018
LU28.08.2018
CH31.08.2018
LI31.08.2018
BG18.10.2018
NO18.10.2018
GR19.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
Former [2019/23]AL18.07.2018
AT18.07.2018
CZ18.07.2018
EE18.07.2018
ES18.07.2018
FI18.07.2018
HR18.07.2018
IT18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
LV18.07.2018
MC18.07.2018
NL18.07.2018
PL18.07.2018
RO18.07.2018
RS18.07.2018
SK18.07.2018
LU28.08.2018
CH31.08.2018
LI31.08.2018
BG18.10.2018
NO18.10.2018
GR19.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
Former [2019/22]AL18.07.2018
AT18.07.2018
CZ18.07.2018
FI18.07.2018
HR18.07.2018
IT18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
LV18.07.2018
NL18.07.2018
PL18.07.2018
RO18.07.2018
RS18.07.2018
LU28.08.2018
CH31.08.2018
LI31.08.2018
BG18.10.2018
NO18.10.2018
GR19.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
Former [2019/21]AL18.07.2018
AT18.07.2018
FI18.07.2018
HR18.07.2018
IT18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
LV18.07.2018
NL18.07.2018
PL18.07.2018
RS18.07.2018
LU28.08.2018
CH31.08.2018
LI31.08.2018
BG18.10.2018
NO18.10.2018
GR19.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
Former [2019/12]AL18.07.2018
AT18.07.2018
FI18.07.2018
HR18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
LV18.07.2018
NL18.07.2018
PL18.07.2018
RS18.07.2018
BG18.10.2018
NO18.10.2018
GR19.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
Former [2019/11]AT18.07.2018
FI18.07.2018
HR18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
NL18.07.2018
PL18.07.2018
RS18.07.2018
BG18.10.2018
NO18.10.2018
GR19.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
Former [2019/10]AT18.07.2018
FI18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
NL18.07.2018
PL18.07.2018
RS18.07.2018
BG18.10.2018
NO18.10.2018
GR19.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
Former [2019/08]FI18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
NL18.07.2018
NO18.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
Former [2019/07]LT18.07.2018
NL18.07.2018
Former [2019/04]NL18.07.2018
Documents cited:Search[I]US2010224783  (FRANK DAVID L [US]) [I] 1-5 * claims 1-44 *;
 [I]US2009140158  (CLOTHIER BRENT ALLEN [US] ET AL) [I] 1-5 * claims 1-36 *;
 [I]US2013193329  (SRIVASTAVA ALOK MANI [US] ET AL) [I] 1-5 * paragraphs [0003] - [0004] - [00 5] - [0008]; example 1; claims 1-27 *;
 [A]EP2461186  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0031] - [0042]; claims 1-10 *;
 [A]EP2256177  (TOKUYAMA CORP [JP]; UNIV TOHOKU [JP]) [A] 1-5 * claims 1-9 *;
 [A]JP2007070496  (JAPAN ATOMIC ENERGY AGENCY; KATAGIRI MASAKI) [A] 1-5 * abstract *
International search[XP]WO2014092202  (TOKUYAMA CORP.);
 [A]JP2005200460  (JAPAN ATOMIC ENERGY RESEARCH INSTITUTE);
 [A]JP2007070496  (JAPAN ATOMIC ENERGY AGENCY)
by applicantWO2009119378
 JP20120271318