Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3044848

EP3044848 - WIRELESS POWER TRANSFER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  17.06.2016
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.07.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The University of Hong Kong
Pokfulam Road
Hong Kong Special Administrative Region / CN
[2016/29]
Inventor(s)01 / NG, Wai Man
Flat D 13th Floor Block 2
Highland Park
11 Lai Kong Street
Hong Kong SAR / CN
02 / ZHANG, Cheng
Flat C 25th Floor
Maison Rose
270 Cheung Sha Wan Road
Kowloon
Hong Kong SAR / CN
03 / LIN, Deyan
Room 1304 12th Floor Block B
Whampoa Building
15 Ming On Street
Kowloon
Hong Kong SAR / CN
04 / HUI, Ron Shu Yuen
2B Block 29 Greenwood Terrace
26-28 Sui Wo Road
Shatin
New Territories
Hong Kong SAR / CN
 [2016/29]
Representative(s)inCompass IP Europe Limited
51 Paddock Mead
Harlow, Essex CM18 7RR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/29]inCompass IP Europe Limited
4 Bloomsbury Place
London WC1A 2QA / GB
Application number, filing date14840713.329.07.2014
[2016/29]
WO2014CN83250
Priority number, dateUS20131397540926.08.2013         Original published format: US201313975409
[2016/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015027784
Date:05.03.2015
Language:EN
[2015/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3044848
Date:20.07.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.2015
[2016/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN05.03.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.09.2017
ClassificationInternational:H02J50/00, H02J50/40
[2017/28]
Former International [2016/29]H02J50/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/29]
TitleGerman:DRAHTLOSES STROMÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEM[2016/29]
English:WIRELESS POWER TRANSFER SYSTEM[2016/29]
French:SYSTÈME DE TRANSFERT D'ÉNERGIE SANS FIL[2016/29]
Entry into regional phase18.02.2016National basic fee paid 
18.02.2016Search fee paid 
18.02.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
18.02.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.02.2016Examination requested  [2016/29]
09.04.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
11.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2003062794  (SCHEIBLE GUNTRAM [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,6-12 * paragraphs 24-25 - page 2 * [I] 4,5;
 [XI]US5258766  (MURDOCH GRAHAM A M [AU]) [X] 1-3,6-12 * abstract * [I] 4,5;
 [XI]US3832530  (REITBOECK H, et al) [X] 1-3,6-12 * abstract * [I] 4,5;
 [XA]US2010033021  (BENNETT JAMES D [CZ]) [X] 1-6,8-12 * abstract * [A] 7
International search[X]US2012169139  (KUDO HIROKI [JP]);
 [Y]CN102983636  (LS CABLE & SYSTEM LTD);
 [Y]JP2008283789  (OLYMPUS CORP);
 [Y]JP2004159456  (IDEN VIDEOTRONICS KK);
 [A]US2008298100  (ESAKA KOICHIRO [JP], et al);
 [A]JP2008283791  (OLYMPUS CORP)
by applicantUS2003062794