Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3038565

EP3038565 - EXPANDABLE AND ADJUSTABLE LORDOSIS INTERBODY FUSION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.06.2016
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.03.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SpineEX Inc.
4046 Clipper Court
Fremont, California 94539 / US
[2018/35]
Former [2016/27]For all designated states
Rogers, Andrew
3865 Talton Place
Deephaven, Minnesota 55391 / US
For all designated states
Burrows-Ownbey, Robyn
Unit 601 380 West 22nd Street
Kansas City, Missouri 64108 / US
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2016/27]
Representative(s)Forrest, Stuart , et al
WP Thompson
138 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/27]Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen
WP Thompson
138 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BT / GB
Application number, filing date14841270.329.08.2014
[2016/27]
WO2014US53551
Priority number, dateUS201361871780P29.08.2013         Original published format: US 201361871780 P
[2016/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015031838
Date:05.03.2015
Language:EN
[2015/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3038565
Date:06.07.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.2015
[2016/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US05.03.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.03.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/44, A61F2/30, A61F2/46
[2017/18]
Former International [2016/27]A61F2/44
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/27]
TitleGerman:EXPANDIERBARES UND ANPASSBARES LORDOSE-ZWISCHENWIRBELSTABILISIERUNGSSYSTEM[2016/27]
English:EXPANDABLE AND ADJUSTABLE LORDOSIS INTERBODY FUSION SYSTEM[2016/27]
French:SYSTÈME DE FUSION INTERVERTÉBRALE DE LORDOSE EXPANSIBLE ET AJUSTABLE[2016/27]
Entry into regional phase23.02.2016National basic fee paid 
23.02.2016Search fee paid 
23.02.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
23.02.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.06.2015Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
23.02.2016Examination requested  [2016/27]
27.10.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
01.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
22.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201704   M06   Fee paid on   01.09.2017
Documents cited:Search[XAYI]US6129763  (CHAUVIN JEAN-LUC [FR], et al) [X] 1 * column 3, line 35 - line 41; figure 1 * [A] 9 [Y] 2-8,11-15 [I] 10;
 [X]US2006206207  (DRYER RANDALL F [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0059]; figures 8-10 *;
 [X]US2005010295  (MICHELSON GARY K [US]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0089] - paragraph [0098]; figures 9-11 *;
 [Y]US2011035011  (CAIN CHRISTOPHER MARDEN JOHN [AU]) [Y] 2-8,11-15 * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0092]; figures 1B,11 *
International search[X]US2012323327  (MCAFEE PAUL C [US]);
 [X]US5653763  (ERRICO JOSEPH P [US], et al);
 [Y]US2010185291  (JIMENEZ OMAR F [US], et al);
 [Y]US2013053966  (JIMENEZ OMAR F [US], et al)
by applicantUS6129763