Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3041294

EP3041294 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SEARCHING FOR ACCESS POINT IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.09.2019
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
27.09.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
[2016/27]
Inventor(s)01 / JUNG, Hakyung
72-21 Baumoe-ro 41-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 137-886 / KR
02 / PARK, Jungshin
15-1 Dorim-ro 64ga-gil
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 150-818 / KR
03 / SON, Yeongmoon
No.107-1402
15 Tapsil-ro
Giheung-gu
Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-783 / KR
04 / LEE, Jinsung
No.106-504
171-6 Sinwon-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-390 / KR
 [2016/27]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/27]Jenkins, Richard Gavin
HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
Application number, filing date14841298.401.09.2014
[2016/27]
WO2014KR08154
Priority number, dateKR2013010415930.08.2013         Original published format: KR 20130104159
[2016/27]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015030558
Date:05.03.2015
Language:KO
[2015/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3041294
Date:06.07.2016
Language:EN
[2016/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR05.03.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.12.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04W48/16, // H04W88/06, H04W84/12
[2017/03]
Former International [2016/27]H04W48/16, H04W88/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/27]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM SUCHEN NACH ZUGANGSPUNKTEN IN EINEM DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM[2016/27]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SEARCHING FOR ACCESS POINT IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM[2016/27]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE RECHERCHER UN POINT D'ACCÈS DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL[2016/27]
Entry into regional phase29.02.2016Translation filed 
29.02.2016National basic fee paid 
29.02.2016Search fee paid 
29.02.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
29.02.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.02.2016Examination requested  [2016/27]
24.05.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.09.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
15.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
21.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
24.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]EP2355585  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,5,7,13 * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0061] *;
 [A]US2011040969  (YAO ZONGMING [CN], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0035] *;
 [XI]US2013188628  (LEE JAE SEUNG [KR], et al) [X] 1,5,7,8,13 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0308] - paragraph [0318]; figure 25 * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0295] - paragraph [0306]; figure 24 * [I] 2,4,6,9,11,14,15;
 [X]US2013088983  (PRAGADA RAVIKUMAR V [US], et al) [X] 1,5,7,10,13 * paragraph [0121] - paragraph [0122] *;
 [XI]US2013176897  (WANG LEI [US], et al) [X] 1,5,7,13 * paragraph [0084] - paragraph [0092] * * paragraph [0113] - paragraph [0114] * [I] 3,12
International search[Y]KR20110088761  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.);
 [Y]KR20120032298  (SAMSUNG ELECTRO-MECHANICS CO., LTD.);
 [A]KR20120089807  (INTEL CORP.)