Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3084898

EP3084898 - DEVICE FOR CONTACTING ELECTRICAL CONDUCTORS AND/OR ELECTRICAL CONTACT ELEMENTS, AS WELL AS LAMP OR ELECTRICAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.07.2019
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  28.05.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FI, NL
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tridonic GmbH & Co KG
Färbergasse 15
6851 Dornbirn / AT
[2016/43]
Inventor(s)01 / MOSER, Peter
Berchat 331
A-6135 Stans / AT
02 / RIEDLER, Thomas
Haselweg 10
A-6121 Baumkirchen / AT
 [2016/43]
Representative(s)Rupp, Christian , et al
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstraße 33
80331 München / DE
[2016/43]
Application number, filing date14841356.019.12.2014
[2016/43]
WO2014AT50309
Priority number, dateAT20130000454U19.12.2013         Original published format: AT 4542013 U
[2017/03]
Former [2016/43]AT2013000045419.12.2013
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015089540
Date:25.06.2015
Language:DE
[2015/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3084898
Date:26.10.2016
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2015
[2016/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3084898
Date:07.08.2019
Language:DE
[2019/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/74, H01R9/24, H01R31/02, H01R107/00, H01R4/64
[2016/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUM KONTAKTIEREN VON ELEKTRISCHEN LEITERN UND/ODER ELEKTRISCHEN KONTAKTELEMENTEN, SOWIE LEUCHTE ODER ELEKTRISCHES GERÄT[2016/43]
English:DEVICE FOR CONTACTING ELECTRICAL CONDUCTORS AND/OR ELECTRICAL CONTACT ELEMENTS, AS WELL AS LAMP OR ELECTRICAL DEVICE[2016/43]
French:DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT LA MISE EN CONTACT DE CONDUCTEURS ÉLECTRIQUES ET/OU D'ÉLÉMENTS DE CONTACT ÉLECTRIQUES, ET APPAREIL D'ÉCLAIRAGE OU APPAREIL ÉLECTRIQUE[2016/43]
Entry into regional phase14.06.2016National basic fee paid 
14.06.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
14.06.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.06.2016Examination requested  [2016/43]
21.12.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.03.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.05.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.11.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.01.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.05.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.06.2019Fee for grant paid
28.06.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.06.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
28.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
31.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI07.08.2019
LT07.08.2019
NL07.08.2019
NO07.11.2019
[2020/09]
Former [2020/08]LT07.08.2019
NO07.11.2019
Cited inInternational search[X]US3007131  (DAHLGREN VICTOR F, et al) [X] 1-3,5,8,10 * figures 3-4 *;
 [XY]DE10213854  (OMRON CORP KYOTO [JP]) [X] 1-8,10 * figures 1,2,7,9 * [Y] 9;
 [Y]DE10216574  (WAGO VERWALTUNGS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 9 * figures 1-5 *
ExaminationGB2130819
 JP2007080686
 JP2000243478
 JPH04329270
by applicantAT13096U