Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3042342

EP3042342 - PATTERN RECOGNITION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.07.2018
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  28.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.07.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.08.2018  [2018/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Neural ID LLC
203 Redwood Shores Parkway
Suite 250
Redwood City, California 94065 / US
[2016/28]
Inventor(s)01 / THOMAS, Tyson J.
163 Delmar Street
San Francisco, California 94117 / US
02 / BUSCHELMAN, Kristopher Robert
6 Locksley Avenue Apt. C
San Francisco, California 94122 / US
03 / EVANS, Frank G.
6018 SE 18th Avenue
Portland, Oregon 97202-5308 / US
04 / GEIGER, Karl P.
8 Avocet Drive Apt. 8-104
Redwood City, California 94065 / US
05 / KELLEY, Michael P.
13613 SW Provincial Hill Way
Lake Oswego, Oregon 97035 / US
06 / SCHNEIDER, Eric C.
1975 Fernside Street
Redwood City, California 94061 / US
07 / CARRUTHERS, Timothy J.
160 Wildwood Avenue
San Carlos, California 94070 / US
08 / ADAMS, Jeffrey Brian
11 Highlands Court
Belmont, California 94002 / US
 [2016/28]
Representative(s)Prock, Thomas
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/28]Prock, Thomas
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date14842180.328.08.2014
[2016/28]
WO2014US53292
Priority number, dateUS201361873793P04.09.2013         Original published format: US 201361873793 P
[2016/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015034759
Date:12.03.2015
Language:EN
[2015/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3042342
Date:13.07.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.2015
[2016/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:RU12.03.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.07.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06K9/62, G06F17/00
[2016/28]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/28]
TitleGerman:MUSTERERKENNUNGSSYSTEM[2016/28]
English:PATTERN RECOGNITION SYSTEM[2016/28]
French:SYSTÈME DE RECONNAISSANCE DE MOTIF[2016/28]
Entry into regional phase30.03.2016National basic fee paid 
30.03.2016Search fee paid 
30.03.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
30.03.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.03.2016Examination requested  [2016/28]
20.02.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/34]
29.03.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201603   M06   Fee paid on   27.01.2017
31.08.201704   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]US6778704  (KAWATANI TAKAHIKO [JP]) [X] 1-9 * column 3, line 29 - line 54 * * column 5, line 47 - column 9, line 50; figures 3-5 * * column 16, line 18 - line 26 * * column 20, line 13 - line 30 * [I] 10-15
International search[X]US6778704  (HEWLETT-PACKARD DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, L.P.);
 [X]US2008120108  (FRANK KAO-PING SOONG ET AL);
 [A]US2002152069  (INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION)