Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3041398

EP3041398 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR LIGHT BASED LUNG VISUALIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.11.2018
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.02.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Covidien LP
15 Hampshire Street
Mansfield, MA 02048 / US
[2016/28]
Inventor(s)01 / STOPEK, Joshua B.
4901 Knox Avenue S
Minneapolis, Minnesota 55419-5240 / US
02 / BRANNAN, Joseph D.
3045 Blue Sky Circle 18-201
Erie, Colorado 80516 / US
03 / DICKHANS, William J.
5 Dartmouth Circle
Longmont, Colorado 80503 / US
04 / LADTKOW, Casey M.
1811 Crestview Lane
Erie, Colorado 80516 / US
 [2016/28]
Representative(s)Maschio, Antonio , et al
Maschio & Soames IP Limited
30 Carlton Crescent
Southampton SO15 2EW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/28]Pratt, Richard Wilson
Maschio & Soames IP Limited
30 Carlton Crescent
Southampton SO15 2EW / GB
Application number, filing date14842292.603.09.2014
[2016/28]
WO2014US53896
Priority number, dateUS201361874881P06.09.2013         Original published format: US 201361874881 P
US201462041893P26.08.2014         Original published format: US 201462041893 P
US201462041800P26.08.2014         Original published format: US 201462041800 P
US20141446975727.08.2014         Original published format: US201414469757
[2016/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2015034921
Date:12.03.2015
Language:EN
[2015/10]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3041398
Date:13.07.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.2015
[2016/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR12.03.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.04.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/05, A61B5/08, A61B5/113, A61B1/267, // A61B5/06
[2017/19]
Former International [2016/28]A61B1/267, A61B5/05
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/28]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR LICHTBASIERTE LUNGENVISUALISIERUNG[2016/28]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR LIGHT BASED LUNG VISUALIZATION[2016/28]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE VISUALISATION DES POUMONS FAISANT INTERVENIR LA LUMIÈRE[2016/28]
Entry into regional phase21.03.2016National basic fee paid 
21.03.2016Search fee paid 
21.03.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
21.03.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.03.2016Examination requested  [2016/28]
10.11.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.10.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.02.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
22.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
21.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[E]WO2016033090  (COVIDIEN LP [US]) [E] 1-6,10-12 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2005182295  (SOPER TIMOTHY D [US], et al) [X] 1-10,13-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2010041949  (TOLKOWSKY DAVID [IL]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2008287803  (LI DUN ALEX [US], et al) [A] 8 * paragraph [0047] *;
 [XP]  - LUO XIONGBIAO ET AL, "Beyond Current Guided Bronchoscopy: A Robust and Real-Time Bronchoscopic Ultrasound Navigation System", Lecture Notes in Computer Science (LNCS) 8149: MICCAI 2013, Springer, Berlin, Heidelberg, (20130922), vol. 8149, pages 388 - 395, I, ISSN 0302-9743, ISBN 978-3-642-19166-4, XP047041936 [XP] 1-10 * sections 2.1, 3 and figures *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-642-40811-3_49
 [A]  - RANDY HOU ET AL, "Recent advances in optical coherence tomography for the diagnoses of lung disorders", EXPERT REVIEW OF RESPIRATORY MEDICINE, GB, (20111001), vol. 5, no. 5, doi:10.1586/ers.11.59, ISSN 1747-6348, pages 711 - 724, XP055360797 [A] 1 * sections "Lung Cancer" and "Multimodality Imaging" *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1586/ers.11.59
 [A]  - PYNG LEE ET AL, "Bronchoscopy in Lung Cancer - Appraisal of Current Technology and for the Future", JOURNAL OF THORACIC ONCOLOGY, (20100801), vol. 5, no. 8, pages 1290 - 1300, XP055360794 [A] 13-15 * page 1297 - page 1298 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/JTO.0b013e3181e41843
 [A]  - BOJAN ZARIC ET AL, "Diagnostic value of autofluorescence bronchoscopy in lung cancer", THORACIC CANCER, (20130201), vol. 4, no. 1, doi:10.1111/j.1759-7714.2012.00130.x, ISSN 1759-7706, pages 1 - 8, XP055360790 [A] 13-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1759-7714.2012.00130.x