EP3044261 - FILLED BUTYL RUBBER IONOMER COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.05.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.11.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARLANXEO Singapore Pte. Ltd. 3 a International Business Park 07-10/18, Icon@IPB Tower B Singapore 609935 / SG | [2019/33] |
Former [2018/40] | For all designated states ARLANXEO Singapore Pte. Ltd. 3 a International Business Park 07-10/18, Icon@IPB Tower B Singapore 609935 / SG | ||
Former [2018/24] | For all designated states ARLANXEO Canada Inc. 1265 Vidal Street South Sarnia, ON N7T 7M2 / CA | ||
Former [2016/29] | For all designated states Lanxess Inc. 1265 Vidal Street South Sarnia, Ontario N7T 7M2 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ADKINSON, Dana K. 113 Whisperwood Avenue London, Ontario N6K 4C1 / CA | 02 /
BIELBY, Jon 553 Plympton Street Wyoming, Ontario N0N 1T0 / CA | [2016/29] | Representative(s) | Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Waidmarkt 11 50676 Köln / DE | [2019/33] |
Former [2016/29] | Deblon, Jörg-Stephan LANXESS Deutschland GmbH Kennedyplatz 1 50569 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 14843002.8 | 08.09.2014 | [2016/29] | WO2014CA50847 | Priority number, date | EP20130183546 | 09.09.2013 Original published format: EP 13183546 | EP20140174624 | 27.06.2014 Original published format: EP 14174624 | [2016/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015032000 | Date: | 12.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3044261 | Date: | 20.07.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3044261 | Date: | 14.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 12.03.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B60C1/00, C08L23/22, C08L23/28, C08L23/32, C08L23/36, C08C19/22, C08C19/24, C08L23/26, C08J3/24, C08K3/013 | [2018/49] | CPC: |
C08L23/22 (EP,KR,US);
C08F8/30 (KR);
C08F8/40 (KR);
C08J3/246 (EP,KR,US);
C08K3/013 (EP,KR,US);
C08K3/04 (KR);
C08K3/36 (KR);
C08L23/26 (EP,KR,US);
C08L23/28 (EP,US);
C08J2300/26 (EP,US);
C08J2323/32 (EP,US);
C08K2201/016 (KR);
C08L2312/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L23/22, C08L23/28, C08K3/013 (US,EP);
C08L23/26, C08L23/28, C08K3/013 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2017/11] | B60C1/00, C08L23/22, C08L23/28, C08L23/32, C08L23/36, C08C19/22, C08C19/24, C08L23/26, C08J3/24 | ||
Former IPC [2016/29] | C08L23/26, C08K3/00, C08L57/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEFÜLLTE BUTYLKAUTSCHUKIONOMERVERBINDUNGEN | [2016/29] | English: | FILLED BUTYL RUBBER IONOMER COMPOUNDS | [2016/29] | French: | COMPOSÉS IONOMÈRES DE CAOUTCHOUC BUTYLE CHARGÉS | [2016/29] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2016 | Search fee paid | 11.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/29] | 17.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 22.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 09.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 22.12.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 22.12.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.01.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.09.2014 | AL | 14.08.2019 | AT | 14.08.2019 | CY | 14.08.2019 | CZ | 14.08.2019 | DK | 14.08.2019 | EE | 14.08.2019 | ES | 14.08.2019 | FI | 14.08.2019 | HR | 14.08.2019 | LT | 14.08.2019 | LV | 14.08.2019 | MC | 14.08.2019 | MK | 14.08.2019 | MT | 14.08.2019 | NL | 14.08.2019 | RO | 14.08.2019 | RS | 14.08.2019 | SE | 14.08.2019 | SI | 14.08.2019 | SK | 14.08.2019 | SM | 14.08.2019 | TR | 14.08.2019 | IE | 08.09.2019 | LU | 08.09.2019 | CH | 30.09.2019 | LI | 30.09.2019 | BG | 14.11.2019 | NO | 14.11.2019 | GR | 15.11.2019 | IS | 14.12.2019 | PT | 16.12.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 08.09.2014 | |
AL | 14.08.2019 | ||
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CY | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
MT | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IE | 08.09.2019 | ||
LU | 08.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 08.09.2014 | |
AL | 14.08.2019 | ||
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CY | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IE | 08.09.2019 | ||
LU | 08.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CY | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IE | 08.09.2019 | ||
LU | 08.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IE | 08.09.2019 | ||
LU | 08.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IE | 08.09.2019 | ||
LU | 08.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LU | 08.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | ES | 14.08.2019 | |
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | ES | 14.08.2019 | |
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 14.08.2019 | |
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 14.08.2019 | |
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 14.08.2019 | |
NO | 14.11.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005245649 (PARENT JOHN S [CA], et al) [A] 1-18 * example 4 *; | [A]WO2007022618 (LANXESS INC [CA], et al) [A] 1-18 * examples 1,2; claims 1-17 *; | [X]EP1942136 (LANXESS INC [CA]) [X] 1-18 * examples 34-36; claim 8 *; | [X]US2008242771 (KULBABA KEVIN [CA], et al) [X] 1-18 * examples 1-4; claims 1-10; table 1 *; | [A]WO2010091498 (LANXESS INC [CA], et al) [A] 1-18 * examples 45-46 *; | [A]WO2010091499 (ADKINSON DANA A [CA], et al) [A] 1-18 * examples 32,33; claims 59-64 *; | [X]US2011184087 (CAMPOMIZZI EZIO [CA], et al) [X] 1-18 * examples 1-46; claims 1,7 *; | [A]WO2012083419 (LANXESS INC [CA], et al) [A] 1-18* the whole document *; | [A] - XIE H-Q ET AL, "Polymer blends with two kinds of elastomeric ionomers", POLYMER, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V, GB, vol. 32, no. 1, doi:10.1016/0032-3861(91)90568-4, ISSN 0032-3861, (19910101), pages 95 - 102, (19910101), XP024117781 [A] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0032-3861(91)90568-4 | International search | [X]US5665183 (KRESGE EDWARD NATHAN [US], et al); | [X]CA2604409 (LANXESS INC [CA]); | [A]CA2752505 (LANXESS INC [CA]); | [A]CA2752504 (LANXESS INC [CA]); | [A] - XU, J. ET AL., "Hecheng Xiangjao Gongye", CHINA SYNTHETIC RUBBER INDUSTRY, (200309), vol. 26, no. 5, pages 284 - 287, XP008179916 | by applicant | CA2418884 | EP1942136 | WO2011089083 | - Ullmann's Encyclopedia of Industrial Chemistry, vol. A231 | - MAURICE MORTON, Rubber Technology, Van Nostrand Reinhold Company, (19870000), pages 297 - 300 | - PARENT, J. S.; LISKOVA, A.; WHITNEY, R. A; RESENDES, R., Journal of Polymer Science, Part A: Polymer Chemistry, (20050000), vol. 43, pages 5671 - 5679 | - PARENT, J . S.; LISKOVA, A.; RESENDES, R., Polymer, (20040000), vol. 45, pages 8091 - 8096 | - PARENT, J. S.; PENCIU, A.; GUILLEN- CASTELLANOS, S . A.; LISKOVA, A.; WHITNEY, R. A., Macromolecules, (20040000), vol. 37, pages 7477 - 7483 | - Rubber Technology, Kluwer Academic Publishers, pages 297 - 300 | - Encyclopedia of Polymer Science and Engineering, vol. 4, page 66 |