Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3043732

EP3043732 - SYSTEMS, METHODS AND DEVICES FOR TREATMENT OF TARGET TISSUE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  17.06.2016
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip01.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fractyl Laboratories, Inc.
221 Crescent Street
Suite 102a
Waltham, MA 02453 / US
[2016/29]
Inventor(s)01 / CAPLAN, Jay
34 Clark Street
Belmont, MA 02478 / US
02 / LEVIN, Phillip S.
11 Southwood Road
Storrs, CT 06268 / US
03 / FLAHERTY, R. Maxwell
2122 Kirkland Lake Drive
Auburndale, FL 33823 / US
04 / FLAHERTY, J. Christopher
2122 Kirkland Lake Drive
Auburndale, FL 33823 / US
 [2016/29]
Representative(s)Clark, Jane Anne , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[2016/29]
Application number, filing date14844285.812.09.2014
[2016/29]
WO2014US55514
Priority number, dateUS201361877083P12.09.2013         Original published format: US 201361877083 P
WO2013US6375307.10.2013         Original published format: PCT/US2013/063753
WO2014US4095704.06.2014         Original published format: PCT/US2014/040957
[2016/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015038973
Date:19.03.2015
Language:EN
[2015/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3043732
Date:20.07.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.2015
[2016/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US19.03.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.04.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61B18/04, A61B18/08, A61M29/02
[2016/29]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/29]
TitleGerman:SYSTEME, VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ZIELGEWEBE[2016/29]
English:SYSTEMS, METHODS AND DEVICES FOR TREATMENT OF TARGET TISSUE[2016/29]
French:SYSTÈMES, MÉTHODES ET DISPOSITIFS POUR TRAITER UN TISSU CIBLE[2016/29]
Entry into regional phase24.03.2016National basic fee paid 
24.03.2016Search fee paid 
24.03.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
24.03.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.03.2016Examination requested  [2016/29]
22.11.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
27.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
27.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2013130655  (FRACTYL LAB INC [US]; LEVIN PHILLIP S [US]; CAPLAN JAY [US]; RAJAGOPAL) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0068] , [0102] , [ 121] , [ 130 137] - [0144] - [ 177] - [0181] *
International search[X]US5879347  (SAADAT, V);
 [X]US2012289952  (UTLEY, DS ET AL.);
 [X]US2012197245  (BURNETT, DR ET AL.);
 [X]WO2012099974  (RAJAGOPALAN, H ET AL.);
 [X]US7632291  (STEPHENS, WP ET AL.)
by applicantWO2013130655
 US5879347
 US2012289952
 WO2013US37485
 WO2013US63753
 WO2014US40957
 WO2013US52786
 WO2013US54219