Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3046782

EP3046782 - TIRE STRUCTURE FOR EXTERNALLY MOUNTED DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  24.06.2016
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.07.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC
200 4th Avenue South
Nashville, TN 37201 / US
[2018/38]
Former [2016/30]For all designated states
Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC
535 Marriott Drive 9th Floor
Nashville, Tennessee 37214 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DORFI, Hans
800 Delaware Avenue
Akron, Ohio 44303 / US
02 / SCHEIFELE, Kevin
1667 Stepping Stone Trail
Atwater, Ohio 44201 / US
03 / WEI, Terence
4192 Hawksfield Circle
Copley, Ohio 44321 / US
04 / WILSON, Paul
518 Fernwoood Avenue
Tallmadge, Ohio 44278 / US
05 / MIKLIC, Andrew
2608 Robindale Avenue
Akron, Ohio 44312 / US
 [2016/30]
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/30]Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date14845260.031.07.2014
[2016/30]
WO2014US49004
Priority number, dateUS20131402869917.09.2013         Original published format: US201314028699
[2016/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015041756
Date:26.03.2015
Language:EN
[2015/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3046782
Date:27.07.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.2015
[2016/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR26.03.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.08.2017
ClassificationInternational:B60C13/00, B60C19/00, B60C11/12
[2016/30]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/30]
TitleGerman:REIFENSTRUKTUR FÜR EXTERN MONTIERTE VORRICHTUNG[2016/30]
English:TIRE STRUCTURE FOR EXTERNALLY MOUNTED DEVICE[2016/30]
French:STRUCTURE DE PNEU POUR DISPOSITIF MONTÉ À L'EXTÉRIEUR[2016/30]
Entry into regional phase05.04.2016National basic fee paid 
05.04.2016Search fee paid 
05.04.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
05.04.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.04.2016Examination requested  [2016/30]
09.03.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
10.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
10.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
09.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]US2006000533  (HENDRIE WILLIAM S [CA]) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0017] - [0030]; figure 2; claim - *;
 [A]DE4429216  (UNIROYAL ENGLEBERT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-6 * columns 2,3; figure 3 *;
 [X]US4851809  (MCALISTER STEVE R [US]) [X] 1-6 * columns 2,3; figures 1,2 *;
 [X]WO2006012942  (MICHELIN SOC TECH [FR]; MICHELIN RECH TECH [CH]; COTTIN ALAIN [FR]; PE) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0060] - [0114]; figure - *;
 [X]JP2013107460  (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0023] - [0060]; figures 1,3,8 *
International search[X]US2013126063  (LANDERS ET AL.);
 [Y]US6798140  (REIM ET AL.);
 [A]US6386251  (KOCH ET AL.);
 [A]US2007097698  (SONG ET AL.);
 [A]US6581657  (BROWN, ROBERT WALTER)
by applicant   - BRYAN A. GARNER, A Dictionary of Modern Legal Usage, (19950000), vol. 624