Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3048814

EP3048814 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR AUDIO SIGNAL PROCESSING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.09.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.09.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 23.10.2019  [2019/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wilus Institute of Standards and Technology Inc.
Jeong-hwan Bldg.
Yangjae-dong
2F 48 Mabang-ro
Seocho-gu
Seoul 137-894 / KR
[2016/30]
Inventor(s)01 / LEE, Taegyu
203, 43-5 Hakdong-ro 4-gil
Gangnam-gu, Seoul 06114 / KR
02 / OH, Hyunoh
110-1203
123 Dongpangyo-ro
Bundang-gu Seongnam-si
Gyeonggi-do 13528 / KR
 [2019/43]
Former [2017/37]01 / LEE, Taegyu
210-304 MaehwaMaeul Jugong 2 Danji Apt.
139 Jangmi-ro
Bundang-gu
Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-916 / KR
02 / OH, Hyunoh
110-1203
123 Dongpangyo-ro
Bundang-gu Seongnam-si
Gyeonggi-do 13528 / KR
Former [2016/36]01 / LEE, Taegyu
210-304 MaehwaMaeul Jugong 2 Danji Apt.
139 Jangmi-ro
Bundang-gu
Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-916 / KR
02 / OH, Hyunoh
322-1102 Raemian Sur Apt 12
Byeoryang-ro
Gwacheon-si
Gyeonggi-do 427-739 / KR
Former [2016/35]01 / LEE, Taegyu
210-304 MaehwaMaeul Jugong 2 Danji Apt.
139 Jangmi-ro
Bundang-gu
Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-916 / KR
02 / OH, Hyunoh
QUS Int`l Patent & Law Group
48 Mabang-ro
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06776 / KR
Former [2016/30]01 / LEE, Taegyu
210-304 MaehwaMaeul Jugong 2 Danji Apt.
139 Jangmi-ro
Bundang-gu
Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-916 / KR
02 / OH, Hyunoh
322-1102 Raemian Sur Apt
12 Byeoryang-ro
Gwacheon-si Gyeonggi-do 427-739 / KR
Representative(s)Frenkel, Matthias Alexander
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[2016/30]
Application number, filing date14845972.017.09.2014
[2016/30]
WO2014KR08678
Priority number, dateUS201361878638P17.09.2013         Original published format: US 201361878638 P
KR2013012593622.10.2013         Original published format: KR 20130125936
US201361894442P23.10.2013         Original published format: US 201361894442 P
[2016/30]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015041477
Date:26.03.2015
Language:KO
[2015/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3048814
Date:27.07.2016
Language:EN
[2016/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3048814
Date:23.10.2019
Language:EN
[2019/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR26.03.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.04.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04S3/00, H04S3/02, G10L19/008, G10L19/02, G10L25/48, H03H17/02
[2019/20]
Former International [2017/22]H04S3/00, H04S3/02, G10L19/008, G10L19/02, H03H17/02
Former International [2016/30]H04S3/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/30]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON TONSIGNALEN[2016/30]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR AUDIO SIGNAL PROCESSING[2016/30]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE SIGNAL AUDIO[2016/30]
Entry into regional phase22.03.2016Translation filed 
22.03.2016National basic fee paid 
22.03.2016Search fee paid 
22.03.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
22.03.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.03.2016Examination requested  [2016/30]
08.11.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.05.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.08.2019Fee for grant paid
30.08.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.08.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
20.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
11.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
13.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]US2009103738  (FAURE JULIEN [FR], et al) [X] 1-5,7-11 * the whole document *
 [X]  - EMERIT MARC ET AL, "Efficient Binaural Filtering in QMF Domain for BRIR", AES CONVENTION 122; MAY 2007, AES, 60 EAST 42ND STREET, ROOM 2520 NEW YORK 10165-2520, USA, (20070501), XP040508167 [X] 1,2,6-8,12 * the whole document *
International search[Y]KR20100063113  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al);
 [Y]KR20050123396  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]);
 [Y]KR20090047341  (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR]);
 [A]KR20120013893  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]);
 [A]US2005117762  (SAKURAI ATSUHIRO [JP], et al)