Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3050351

EP3050351 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR INCREASED CALL QUALITY AND SUCCESS RATE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.07.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.04.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  29.03.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  28.11.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.07.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 14.08.2019  [2019/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Google LLC
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
[2017/45]
Former [2016/31]For all designated states
Google Inc.
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
Inventor(s)01 / JAIN, Arvind
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, California 94043 / US
02 / SALISBURY, Dylan
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, California 94043 / US
03 / WIESEN, Alex
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, California 94043 / US
04 / REILLY, Matthew
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, California 94043 / US
05 / JAWAD, Anthony
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, California 94043 / US
06 / LUNDQVIST, Tomas
Kungsbron 2
S-11122 Stockholm / SE
 [2016/31]
Representative(s)Boult Wade Tennant LLP
5th Floor, Salisbury Square House
8, Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
[2019/33]
Former [2016/31]Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date14849102.026.09.2014
[2016/31]
WO2014US57709
Priority number, dateUS201361883644P27.09.2013         Original published format: US 201361883644 P
US20131414091326.12.2013         Original published format: US201314140913
[2016/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015048439
Date:02.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3050351
Date:03.08.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.2015
[2016/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3050351
Date:14.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR02.04.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.07.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04W28/02, H04W48/18, H04W80/10, H04W24/08, H04L29/06
[2017/18]
Former International [2016/31]H04W28/02, H04W48/18, H04W80/10, H04W24/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/31]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR ERHÖHTE ANRUFQUALITÄTS- UND ERFOLGSQUOTE[2016/31]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR INCREASED CALL QUALITY AND SUCCESS RATE[2016/31]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉS À UNE QUALITÉ D'APPEL ET À UN TAUX DE RÉUSSITE AMÉLIORÉS[2016/31]
Entry into regional phase20.04.2016National basic fee paid 
20.04.2016Search fee paid 
20.04.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
20.04.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.04.2016Examination requested  [2016/31]
24.01.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.03.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.07.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.09.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
23.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.11.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.03.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
24.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.07.2019Fee for grant paid
02.07.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.07.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
27.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2013148567  (EFRATI TZAHI [IL], et al) [X] 1,7-10,12,13 * abstract * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0073] * [I] 2-6
International search[Y]US2011096673  (CRAIG STEVENSON ET AL.);
 [X]US2007064894  (EDWARD FRANZ ARMSTRONG ET AL.);
 [A]US2007037550  (FREDERIC RASSAM);
 [A]US2007127391  (LEE GOODMAN);
 [A]US2006098625  (JOEL W. KING ET AL.)
by applicantUS2013148567