Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3050638

EP3050638 - CENTRIFUGALLY CAST COMPOSITE ROLL AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.03.2018
Database last updated on 23.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip31.08.2018New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hitachi Metals, Ltd.
2-70, Konan 1-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8224 / JP
[2016/31]
Inventor(s)01 / ODA, Nozomu
c/o Hitachi Metals Ltd.
Wakamatsu
9-1 Kitahama 1-chome
Wakamatsu-ku
Kitakyusyu-shi Fukuoka 808-0023 / JP
02 / SEGAWA, Takayuki
c/o Hitachi Metals Ltd.
Wakamatsu
9-1 Kitahama 1-chome
Wakamatsu-ku
Kitakyusyu-shi Fukuoka 808-0023 / JP
03 / NOZAKI, Yasunori
c/o Hitachi Metals Ltd.
Wakamatsu
9-1 Kitahama 1-chome
Wakamatsu-ku
Kitakyusyu-shi Fukuoka 808-0023 / JP
04 / HATTORI, Toshiyuki
c/o Hitachi Metals Ltd.
Wakamatsu
9-1 Kitahama 1-chome
Wakamatsu-ku
Kitakyusyu-shi Fukuoka 808-0023 / JP
 [2016/31]
Representative(s)Diehl & Partner GbR
Patentanwälte
Erika-Mann-Strasse 9
80636 München / DE
[2016/31]
Application number, filing date14849491.728.08.2014
[2016/31]
WO2014JP72584
Priority number, dateJP2013019895025.09.2013         Original published format: JP 2013198950
[2016/31]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015045720
Date:02.04.2015
Language:JA
[2015/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3050638
Date:03.08.2016
Language:EN
[2016/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP02.04.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.04.2017
ClassificationInternational:B21B27/02, B22D13/02, C22C37/00
[2016/31]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/31]
TitleGerman:ZENTRIFUGAL GEGOSSENE VERBUNDSTOFFWALZE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON[2016/31]
English:CENTRIFUGALLY CAST COMPOSITE ROLL AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME[2016/31]
French:ROULEAU COMPOSITE MOULÉ PAR CENTRIFUGATION ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION[2016/31]
Entry into regional phase22.04.2016Translation filed 
22.04.2016National basic fee paid 
22.04.2016Search fee paid 
22.04.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
22.04.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.04.2016Examination requested  [2016/31]
16.11.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.03.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.08.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
28.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
13.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[AP]EP2740552  (HITACHI METALS LTD [JP]) [AP] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0073] * * example 3; tables 1-4 *;
 [XA]EP0464780  (KUBOTA KK [JP]) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * page 2, line 46 - line 50 * * example 2; table 1 * [A] 4;
 [XA]JP2000160277  (KUBOTA KK) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * paragraph [0013] * * example 1; table 1 * [A] 4;
 [XA]JP2000178675  (KUBOTA KK) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * paragraph [0013] * * example 1; table 1 * [A] 4
International search[A]JP2006281301  (NIPPON STEEL CORP, et al);
 [A]JP2007245217  (KUBOTA KK);
 [A]JPH08117965  (NIPPON STEEL CORP)
by applicantJPH06304612
 JP2012213780