Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3051276

EP3051276 - ANALYSIS DEVICE, MICROSCOPE DEVICE, ANALYSIS METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.07.2016
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nikon Corporation
15-3, Konan 2-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-6290 / JP
[2016/31]
Inventor(s)01 / SASE, Ichiro
c/o NIKON CORPORATION
Intellectual Property Division
15-3, Konan 2-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-6290 / JP
 [2016/31]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2016/31]
Application number, filing date14850023.426.09.2014
[2016/31]
WO2014JP75658
Priority number, dateJP2013020070527.09.2013         Original published format: JP 2013200705
[2016/31]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015046440
Date:02.04.2015
Language:JA
[2015/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3051276
Date:03.08.2016
Language:EN
[2016/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP02.04.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.04.2017
ClassificationInternational:G01N21/64, G02B21/00, G02B21/16, G02B21/36, G02B27/58, G02B27/56, G06T7/90, G06T7/11
[2017/22]
Former International [2016/31]G01N21/64, G02B21/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/31]
TitleGerman:ANALYSEVORRICHTUNG, MIKROSKOPVORRICHTUNG, ANALYSEVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM[2016/31]
English:ANALYSIS DEVICE, MICROSCOPE DEVICE, ANALYSIS METHOD, AND PROGRAM[2016/31]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ANALYSE, DISPOSITIF DE MICROSCOPE, PROCÉDÉ D'ANALYSE, ET PROGRAMME[2016/31]
Entry into regional phase24.03.2016Translation filed 
24.03.2016National basic fee paid 
24.03.2016Search fee paid 
24.03.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
24.03.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.03.2016Examination requested  [2016/31]
15.11.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
11.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XI]DE102009031231  (ZEISS CARL MICROIMAGING GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,7-9,12-15 * the whole document * [I] 2-6,10,11,16;
 [XI]WO2011098304  (LEICA MICROSYSTEMS [DE], et al) [X] 1,12-15 * abstract * [I] 2-11,16;
 [X]DE102010035003  (PICOQUANT GMBH UNTERNEHMEN FUER OPTOELEKTRONISCHE FORSCHUNG UND ENTWICKLUNG [DE]) [X] 1,12-15 * figure - * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0075] * * paragraph [0123] - paragraph [0139] *;
 [A]US2012062722  (SASE ICHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *
 [X]  - STEFAN GEISSBUEHLER ET AL, "Comparison between SOFI and STORM", BIOMEDICAL OPTICS EXPRESS, (20110301), vol. 2, no. 3, doi:10.1364/BOE.2.000408, ISSN 2156-7085, page 408, XP055010422 [X] 1,12-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/BOE.2.000408
International search[X]JP2012510066  (CARL ZEISS MICROIMAGING GMBH);
 [X]JP2012530947  (CARL ZEISS MICROSCOPY GMBH);
 [Y]JP2011508214  (PRESIDENT AND FELLOWS OF HARVARD COLLEGE)
by applicantUS2008032414
 US7626695
    - RAJESH BABU SEKAR; AMMASI PERIASAMY, "Fluorescence resonance energy transfer (FRET) microscopy imaging of live cell protein localizations", THE JOURNAL OF CELL BIOLOGY, (20030303), vol. 160, no. 5, pages 629 - 633
    - RICHARD N. DAY; FRED SCHAUFELE, "Imaging Molecular Interactions in Living Cells", ENDOCRINE SOCIETY, MOLECULAR ENDOCRINOLOGY, (200507), vol. 19, no. 7, pages 1675 - 1686
    - "Spatial Microstimuli in Endothelial Mechanosignaling", PETER F. DAVIES; JENNY ZILBERBERG; BRIAN P. HELMKE, Journal of the American Heart Association, Circulation Research, AMERICAN HEART ASSOCIATION, (2003), vol. 92, pages 359 - 370