Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3056058

EP3056058 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR HANDLING CIRCUIT SWITCHED CALLS AT A USER EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.08.2019
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.04.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.04.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.10.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BlackBerry Limited
2200 University Avenue East
Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA
[2016/33]
Inventor(s)01 / MAHMOOD, Hamid
4000 Innovation Drive
Ext. 13250
Kanata, Ontario K2K 3K1 / CA
02 / WADJEU, Mathurin
49 Castle Glen Crest
Ottawa, Ontario K2L 4G9 / CA
 [2016/33]
Representative(s)Hanna Moore + Curley
Garryard House
25/26 Earlsfort Terrace
Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2019/38]Hibbert, Juliet Jane Grace , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
Former [2016/33]Hibbert, Juliet Jane Grace , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date14852175.006.10.2014
[2016/33]
WO2014CA00727
Priority number, dateUS20131404979609.10.2013         Original published format: US201314049796
[2016/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015051443
Date:16.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3056058
Date:17.08.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.2015
[2016/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3056058
Date:18.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CA16.04.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.04.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04W60/00, // H04W88/06, H04W36/00
[2019/04]
Former International [2017/20]H04W60/00, // H04W88/06, H04W76/02, H04W36/00
Former International [2016/33]H04W76/02, H04W60/00, H04W88/06
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/33]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HANDHABUNG VON LEITUNGSVERMITTELTEN ANRUFEN BEI EINER BENUTZERVORRICHTUNG[2016/33]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR HANDLING CIRCUIT SWITCHED CALLS AT A USER EQUIPMENT[2016/33]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR GÉRER DES COMMUNICATIONS PAR COMMUTATION DE CIRCUIT AU NIVEAU D'UN ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR[2016/33]
Entry into regional phase05.05.2016National basic fee paid 
05.05.2016Search fee paid 
05.05.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
05.05.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.05.2016Examination requested  [2016/33]
07.11.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.01.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.03.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
18.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.08.2019Fee for grant paid
06.08.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.08.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP19182057.0  / EP3570603
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
29.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2013080098  (RENESAS MOBILE CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,6-10,12 * abstract * * page 3, line 17 - page 7, line 10 * * page 11, line 22 - page 12, line 17 * * figures 3,4,7 * [I] 3-5,11,13-15;
 [XI]US2010329244  (BUCKLEY ADRIAN [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6-10,12 * abstract * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0069] * * figures 1,3,5 * [I] 3-5,11,13-15;
 [XI]WO2010105222  (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6-10,12 * abstract * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0100] * * figures 5,7 * [I] 3-5,11,13-15;
 [XI]WO2011020002  (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA], et al) [X] 1,2,6-10,12 * abstract * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0080] * * figures 6,7 * [I] 3-5,11,13-15;
 [A]  - VODAFONE, "Minimising Location Updates during CS Fall Back", 3GPP DRAFT; S2-100550, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100301), vol. CT WG1, no. San-Francisco; 20100222, XP050409207 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [A]  - NTT DOCOMO, "Separate LAU and RAU procedures in CS fallback procedure", 3GPP DRAFT; S2-114783_DISC-SEPARATE_LARA_PROCEDURE_MANDATORY_REV03, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20111107), vol. SA WG2, no. San Francisco, USA; 20111114 - 20111118, XP050575221 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
International search[X]WO2013080098  (RENESAS MOBILE CORP [JP], et al);
 [Y]WO2013129994  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE])