Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3055318

EP3055318 - DIHYDROXYALKYL SUBSTITUTED POLYGALACTOMANNAN, AND METHODS FOR PRODUCING AND USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.07.2016
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.04.2018Change - applicantpublished on 16.05.2018  [2018/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hercules LLC
500 Hercules Road
Wilmington, DE 19808 / US
[2018/20]
Former [2016/33]For all designated states
Hercules Incorporated
500 Hercules Incorporated
Wilmington, DE 19808 / US
Inventor(s)01 / FRANZKE, Michael Albert Herman
Avenue Carnisse 314
NL-2993 ML Barendrecht / NL
02 / ZHANG, Xiaochun
Torenmolen 115
NL-2992 DH Barendrecht / NL
03 / KROON, Gijsbert
Buitendams 472
NL-3371 BW Hardinxveld Giessendam / NL
 [2016/33]
Representative(s)Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner
Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23
50668 Köln / DE
[2016/33]
Application number, filing date14852405.102.10.2014
[2016/33]
WO2014US58856
Priority number, dateUS201361887679P07.10.2013         Original published format: US 201361887679 P
[2016/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2015054026
Date:16.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/15]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3055318
Date:17.08.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.2015
[2016/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US26.11.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.04.2017
ClassificationInternational:C07H3/00, A61Q5/02, A61K8/60, A61Q5/06, A61K8/73
[2017/18]
Former International [2016/33]C07H3/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/33]
TitleGerman:DIHYDROXYALKYLSUBSTITUIERTES POLYGALACTOMANNAN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG DAVON[2016/33]
English:DIHYDROXYALKYL SUBSTITUTED POLYGALACTOMANNAN, AND METHODS FOR PRODUCING AND USING THE SAME[2016/33]
French:POLYGALACTOMANNANE SUBSTITUÉ PAR DIHYDROXYALKYLE, ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION ET D'UTILISATION[2016/33]
Entry into regional phase09.05.2016National basic fee paid 
09.05.2016Search fee paid 
27.05.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
27.05.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.05.2016Examination requested  [2016/33]
07.06.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2011081907  (LUBRIZOL ADVANCED MAT INC [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * claims 1, 23, 46 * * paragraphs [0029] , [0049] *
International search[X]US2013129639  (ANDERSON ERIC H [US], et al) [X] 1-6, 18-26 * Abstract, para [0001], para [0005], para [0006], para [0011], para [0018], para [0012], para [0029], para [00335], para [0024], para [0057], para [0066], para [0083], para [0086], para [0089], para [0096], para [0070], para [0105], para [0125], para [0228], and entire document *;
 [Y]US2011213139  (CHAN ANITA N [US], et al) [Y] 1-6, 18-26 * Abstract, para [0006], para [0109]. para [0039], and entire document *;
 [Y]US2010178261  (LEPILLEUR CAROLE A [US]) [Y] 1-6, 18-24 * Abstract, para [0002], para [0012], para [0014], and entire document *;
 [Y]US2007292380  (STAUDIGEL JAMES ANTHONY [US], et al) [Y] 1-6, 18-26 * Abstract, para [0001], para [0035], and entire document *;
 [Y]US5128462  (ZODY GEORGE M [US]) [Y] 1-6, 18-26 * Abstract, col 1 In 5-20, *;
 [Y]US2011189248  (BALDARO EVA [IT], et al) [Y] 1-6, 18-26 * Abstract, para [0017], para [0031], para [0057] and entire document *;
 [Y]US2010075880  (DUPONT JEFFREY SCOTT [US], et al) [Y] 1-6, 18-26 * Abstract, para [0048], para [0041], and entire document *;
 [A]US2005026794  (UTZ FERDINAND [DE], et al) [A] 1-6, 18-26 * Abstract, para [015], para [020] *;
 [A]US2009047227  (LEPILLEUR CAROLE A [US]) [A] 1-6, 18-26 * Abstract, para [005], para [013] *