Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3055028

EP3055028 - MUSCLE CELL PATCHES AND USES THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.10.2017
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The University of Arizona
Tech Transfer Arizona
220 West Sixth Street
4th Floor
Tucson, AZ 85701 / US
For all designated states
The United States Government as represented by The Department of Veterans Affairs
810 Vermont Avenue
10P9TT
Washington, District of Columbia 20420 / US
[2018/29]
Former [2016/33]For all designated states
The Arizona Board of Regents on behalf of the University of Arizona
Tech Tanger Arizona
220 W. Sixth Street
4th Floor
Tucson, AZ 85701 / US
For all designated states
The United States Government as represented by The Department of Veterans Affairs
810 Vermont Avenue
10P9TT
Washington, District of Columbia 20420 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LANCASTER, Jordan, J.
c/o The UNIVERSITY OFARIZONA
Tech Transfer Arizona
220 West Sixth Street
4th Floor
Tucson, AZ 85701 / US
02 / GOLDMAN, Steven
c/o THE UNIVERSITY OF ARIZONA
Tech Transfer Arizona
220 West Sixth Street
4th Floor
Tucson, AZ 85701 / US
 [2016/33]
Representative(s)Ascherl, Andreas , et al
KEHL, ASCHERL, LIEBHOFF & ETTMAYR
Patentanwälte - Partnerschaft
Emil-Riedel-Strasse 18
80538 München / DE
[2016/33]
Application number, filing date14852537.108.10.2014
[2016/33]
WO2014US59688
Priority number, dateUS201361888882P09.10.2013         Original published format: US 201361888882 P
[2016/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015054383
Date:16.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3055028
Date:17.08.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.2015
[2016/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US16.04.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.03.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61P9/10, A61K35/34, C12N5/077, A61P9/00
[2016/33]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/33]
TitleGerman:MUSKELZELLENPFLASTER UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON[2016/33]
English:MUSCLE CELL PATCHES AND USES THEREFOR[2016/33]
French:TIMBRES DE CELLULE MUSCULAIRE ET LEURS UTILISATIONS[2016/33]
Entry into regional phase14.04.2016National basic fee paid 
14.04.2016Search fee paid 
14.04.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
14.04.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.04.2016Examination requested  [2016/33]
22.09.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.10.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.05.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.08.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.02.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.04.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.08.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
29.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
28.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[I]US2009169521  (LEVENBERG SHULAMIT [IL] ET AL) [I] 1-15 * claims 1-66 *;
 [X]WO2013056019  (UNIV PENNSYLVANIA [US]) [X] 1-15 * page 26, line 4 - page 27, line 24 * * figure 4 * * page 50 - page 51 *;
 [Y]  - B. C. KNOLLMANN, "Induced Pluripotent Stem Cell-Derived Cardiomyocytes: Boutique Science or Valuable Arrhythmia Model?", CIRCULATION RESEARCH., US, (20130315), vol. 112, no. 6, doi:10.1161/CIRCRESAHA.112.300567, ISSN 0009-7330, pages 969 - 976, XP055341969 [Y] 1-15 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/CIRCRESAHA.112.300567
 [I]  - SHIBA YUJI ET AL, "Cardiac Applications for Human Pluripotent Stem Cells", CURRENT PHARMACEUTICAL DESIGN, BENTHAM SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, NL, (20090801), vol. 15, no. 24, doi:10.2174/138161209788923804, ISSN 1381-6128, pages 2791 - 2806, XP009170979 [I] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/138161209788923804
 [Y]  - KAREEN L. KREUTZIGER ET AL, "Engineered Human Cardiac Tissue", PEDIATRIC CARDIOLOGY, US, (20110204), vol. 32, no. 3, doi:10.1007/s00246-011-9888-9, ISSN 0172-0643, pages 334 - 341, XP055342049 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00246-011-9888-9
 [Y]  - L. ZAKHAROVA ET AL, "Transplantation of cardiac progenitor cell sheet onto infarcted heart promotes cardiogenesis and improves function", CARDIOVASCULAR RESEARCH, GB, (20100129), vol. 87, no. 1, doi:10.1093/cvr/cvq027, ISSN 0008-6363, pages 40 - 49, XP055342051 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/cvr/cvq027
 [I]  - L. YE ET AL, "Patching the Heart: Cardiac Repair From Within and Outside", CIRCULATION RESEARCH., US, (20130913), vol. 113, no. 7, doi:10.1161/CIRCRESAHA.113.300216, ISSN 0009-7330, pages 922 - 932, XP055341979 [I] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/CIRCRESAHA.113.300216
 [Y]  - NANAKO KAWAGUCHI ET AL, "3D-Culture System for Heart Regeneration and Cardiac Medicine", BIOMED RESEARCH INTERNATIONAL, (20130101), vol. 2013, doi:10.1155/2013/895967, ISSN 2314-6133, pages 1 - 6, XP055341985 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1155/2013/895967
 [X]  - LANCASTER J J ET AL, "Construction of a Spontaneously Contracting Biologically Active Cardiomyocyte Scaffold", JOURNAL OF CARDIAL FAILURE, CHURCHILL LIVINGSTONE, NAPERVILLE, IL, US, vol. 15, no. 6, ISSN 1071-9164, (20090801), pages S44 - S45, (20090730), XP026390585 [X] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [YP]  - GWANGHYUN JUNG ET AL, "hiPSC Modeling of Inherited Cardiomyopathies", CURRENT TREATMENT OPTIONS IN CARDIOVASCULAR MEDICINE, US, (20140517), vol. 16, no. 7, doi:10.1007/s11936-014-0320-7, ISSN 1092-8464, XP055341992 [YP] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11936-014-0320-7
 [XP]  - LANCASTER JORDAN J ET AL, "An electrically coupled tissue-engineered cardiomyocyte scaffold improves cardiac function in rats with chronic heart failure", JOURNAL OF HEART AND LUNG TRANSPLANTATION, (20131217), vol. 33, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.HEALUN.2013.12.004, ISSN 1053-2498, pages 438 - 445, XP028837908 [XP] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.healun.2013.12.004
International search[X]US2012128637  (LANCASTER ET AL.);
 [Y]US2008145344  (DESHPANDE ET AL.)