blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3057688

EP3057688 - IMPROVING THE CHEMICAL STABILITY OF FILTRATION MEMBRANES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.11.2022
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.12.2021
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.08.2021
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.04.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF SE
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE
[2016/34]
Inventor(s)01 / MENOZZI, Edoardo
Seminarstrasse 66
CH-5230 Wettingen / CH
02 / HEIJNEN, Martin
Lechanger 2
86899 Landsberg am Lech / DE
03 / WEBER, Martin
Diedesfelder Str. 26
67487 Maikammer / DE
04 / JANSSEN, Nicole
Am Hildegardisberg 5a
55234 Bermersheim / DE
 [2016/34]
Application number, filing date14854746.613.10.2014
[2016/34]
WO2014IB65254
Priority number, dateEP2013018868715.10.2013         Original published format: EP 13188687
[2016/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2015056145
Date:23.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3057688
Date:24.08.2016
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2016/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3057688
Date:05.01.2022
Language:EN
[2022/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN23.04.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.09.2017
ClassificationIPC:B01D69/02, B01D71/68
[2017/27]
CPC:
B01D69/02 (EP,US); B01D65/022 (US); B01D61/58 (US);
B01D67/002 (US); B01D69/04 (US); B01D69/087 (US);
B01D71/68 (EP,US); B29C48/0012 (EP,US); B29C48/022 (EP,US);
B29C48/919 (EP,US); C02F1/44 (US); B01D2321/04 (US);
B01D2321/168 (US); B01D2325/24 (EP,US); B01D2325/28 (US);
B01D2325/30 (EP,US); B29K2081/06 (US); B29K2995/0068 (US);
B29L2031/755 (US); C02F2305/02 (US) (-)
Former IPC [2016/34]B01D69/14, B01D71/68, B01D67/00, C08L81/06
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/34]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ERHÖHUNG DER CHEMISCHEN STABILITÄT VON FILTERUNGSMEMBRANEN[2016/34]
English:IMPROVING THE CHEMICAL STABILITY OF FILTRATION MEMBRANES[2016/34]
French:AMÉLIORATION DE LA STABILITÉ CHIMIQUE DE MEMBRANES DE FILTRATION[2016/34]
Entry into regional phase17.05.2016National basic fee paid 
17.05.2016Search fee paid 
17.05.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
17.05.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.05.2016Examination requested  [2016/34]
28.02.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.09.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.03.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.08.2021Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.11.2021Fee for grant paid
23.11.2021Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.11.2021Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)06.10.2022No opposition filed within time limit [2022/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
02.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
31.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
31.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
02.11.2020Renewal fee patent year 07
02.11.2021Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU13.10.2014
AL05.01.2022
AT05.01.2022
CY05.01.2022
CZ05.01.2022
DK05.01.2022
EE05.01.2022
FI05.01.2022
HR05.01.2022
LT05.01.2022
LV05.01.2022
MC05.01.2022
PL05.01.2022
RO05.01.2022
RS05.01.2022
SE05.01.2022
SI05.01.2022
SK05.01.2022
SM05.01.2022
BG05.04.2022
NO05.04.2022
GR06.04.2022
IS05.05.2022
PT05.05.2022
[2024/21]
Former [2024/18]HU13.10.2014
AL05.01.2022
AT05.01.2022
CZ05.01.2022
DK05.01.2022
EE05.01.2022
FI05.01.2022
HR05.01.2022
LT05.01.2022
LV05.01.2022
MC05.01.2022
PL05.01.2022
RO05.01.2022
RS05.01.2022
SE05.01.2022
SI05.01.2022
SK05.01.2022
SM05.01.2022
BG05.04.2022
NO05.04.2022
GR06.04.2022
IS05.05.2022
PT05.05.2022
Former [2023/25]AL05.01.2022
AT05.01.2022
CZ05.01.2022
DK05.01.2022
EE05.01.2022
FI05.01.2022
HR05.01.2022
LT05.01.2022
LV05.01.2022
MC05.01.2022
PL05.01.2022
RO05.01.2022
RS05.01.2022
SE05.01.2022
SI05.01.2022
SK05.01.2022
SM05.01.2022
BG05.04.2022
NO05.04.2022
GR06.04.2022
IS05.05.2022
PT05.05.2022
Former [2023/10]AL05.01.2022
AT05.01.2022
CZ05.01.2022
DK05.01.2022
EE05.01.2022
FI05.01.2022
HR05.01.2022
LT05.01.2022
LV05.01.2022
PL05.01.2022
RO05.01.2022
RS05.01.2022
SE05.01.2022
SI05.01.2022
SK05.01.2022
SM05.01.2022
BG05.04.2022
NO05.04.2022
GR06.04.2022
IS05.05.2022
PT05.05.2022
Former [2023/01]AL05.01.2022
AT05.01.2022
CZ05.01.2022
DK05.01.2022
EE05.01.2022
FI05.01.2022
HR05.01.2022
LT05.01.2022
LV05.01.2022
PL05.01.2022
RO05.01.2022
RS05.01.2022
SE05.01.2022
SK05.01.2022
SM05.01.2022
BG05.04.2022
NO05.04.2022
GR06.04.2022
IS05.05.2022
PT05.05.2022
Former [2022/49]AT05.01.2022
CZ05.01.2022
DK05.01.2022
EE05.01.2022
FI05.01.2022
HR05.01.2022
LT05.01.2022
LV05.01.2022
PL05.01.2022
RO05.01.2022
RS05.01.2022
SE05.01.2022
SK05.01.2022
SM05.01.2022
BG05.04.2022
NO05.04.2022
GR06.04.2022
IS05.05.2022
PT05.05.2022
Former [2022/48]AT05.01.2022
CZ05.01.2022
DK05.01.2022
EE05.01.2022
FI05.01.2022
HR05.01.2022
LT05.01.2022
LV05.01.2022
PL05.01.2022
RO05.01.2022
RS05.01.2022
SE05.01.2022
SM05.01.2022
BG05.04.2022
NO05.04.2022
GR06.04.2022
IS05.05.2022
PT05.05.2022
Former [2022/47]AT05.01.2022
DK05.01.2022
FI05.01.2022
HR05.01.2022
LT05.01.2022
LV05.01.2022
PL05.01.2022
RO05.01.2022
RS05.01.2022
SE05.01.2022
SM05.01.2022
BG05.04.2022
NO05.04.2022
GR06.04.2022
IS05.05.2022
PT05.05.2022
Former [2022/46]AT05.01.2022
DK05.01.2022
FI05.01.2022
HR05.01.2022
LT05.01.2022
LV05.01.2022
PL05.01.2022
RS05.01.2022
SE05.01.2022
BG05.04.2022
NO05.04.2022
GR06.04.2022
IS05.05.2022
PT05.05.2022
Former [2022/42]AT05.01.2022
FI05.01.2022
HR05.01.2022
LT05.01.2022
LV05.01.2022
PL05.01.2022
RS05.01.2022
SE05.01.2022
BG05.04.2022
NO05.04.2022
GR06.04.2022
IS05.05.2022
PT05.05.2022
Former [2022/39]AT05.01.2022
FI05.01.2022
HR05.01.2022
LT05.01.2022
LV05.01.2022
PL05.01.2022
RS05.01.2022
SE05.01.2022
BG05.04.2022
NO05.04.2022
GR06.04.2022
PT05.05.2022
Former [2022/36]AT05.01.2022
HR05.01.2022
LT05.01.2022
LV05.01.2022
PL05.01.2022
RS05.01.2022
SE05.01.2022
BG05.04.2022
NO05.04.2022
GR06.04.2022
PT05.05.2022
Former [2022/35]HR05.01.2022
LT05.01.2022
RS05.01.2022
SE05.01.2022
BG05.04.2022
NO05.04.2022
PT05.05.2022
Former [2022/34]LT05.01.2022
NO05.04.2022
PT05.05.2022
Former [2022/33]LT05.01.2022
NO05.04.2022
Documents cited:Search[XI]JPH10272343  (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [X] 11-13 * abstract * [I] 1,6-10;
 [XI]JPH11542  (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO) [X] 11-13 * paragraph [0003]; example 1 * * the whole document * [I] 1-10;
 [XY]JP2000140585  (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [X] 11-13 * paragraphs [0002] , [0025] , [0026] , [0034] * [Y] 1-10;
 [XY]JP2008029906  (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [X] 11-13 * paragraphs [0001] , [0011] , [0021] * [Y] 1-10;
 [Y]  - Solvay Advanced Polymers, "Radel A Polyethersulfone, Radel Polyphenylsulfone R, Acudel Polyphenylsulfone Blends Design guide", (20040229), URL: http://www.cgtec.eu/wp-content/uploads/RDG2004ed.pdf, (20140219), XP055103064 [Y] 1-10 * page 27, paragraph 2 *
 [Y]  - BASF, "Ultrason E,S,P (PESU, PSU, PPSU) Product Brochure", (20101031), URL: http://www2.basf.us//PLASTICSWEB/displayanyfile?id=0901a5e180287137, XP002720562 [Y] 1-10 * page 30, paragraph 2 *
 [Y]  - Basf, "Ultrason Resistance to chemicals", (20130731), URL: http://www.basf.com/group/corporate/en/literature-document:/Brand Ultrason-Brochure--Resistance of Ultrason to chemicals-English.pdf, (20140219), XP055103078 [Y] 1-10 * pages 8-13 *
 [Y]  - C. REGULA ET AL, "Ageing of ultrafiltration membranes in contact with sodium hypochlorite and commercial oxidant: Experimental designs as a new ageing protocol", SEPARATION AND PURIFICATION TECHNOLOGY, (20130101), vol. 103, doi:10.1016/j.seppur.2012.10.010, ISSN 1383-5866, pages 119 - 138, XP055078592 [Y] 1-10 * section 2.1-2.3, 2.4.2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.seppur.2012.10.010
 [Y]  - E GAUDICHETMAURIN ET AL, "Ageing of polysulfone ultrafiltration membranes in contact with bleach solutions", JOURNAL OF MEMBRANE SCIENCE, (20061005), vol. 282, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/j.memsci.2006.05.023, ISSN 0376-7388, pages 198 - 204, XP055078591 [Y] 1-10 * section 2.1, 2.2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.memsci.2006.05.023
International search[A]CN85107881  (UNIV JILIN);
 [A]EP0764461  (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]);
 [A]EP1524297  (SOLVAY ADVANCED POLYMERS LLC [US]);
 [A]US6884350  (MULLER HEINZ-JOACHIM [AU]);
 [A]US2010006495  (BUSCHMANN WAYNE E [US])
ExaminationUS5480554
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.