Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3061008

EP3061008 - DATA STORAGE DEVICE SUPPORTING ACCELERATED DATABASE OPERATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.09.2019
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.10.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 11.12.2019  [2019/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Western Digital Technologies, Inc.
3355 Michelson Dr., Suite 100
Irvine, CA 92612 / US
[2018/47]
Former [2016/35]For all designated states
Western Digital Technologies, Inc.
3355 Michelson Drive Suite 100
Irvine, CA 92692 / US
Inventor(s)01 / OBUKHOV, Dmitry S.
3355 Michelson Drive
Suite 100
Irvine, California 92612 / US
02 / BOMBET, Marc A.
3355 Michelson Drive
Suite 100
Irvine, California 92612 / US
 [2016/35]
Representative(s)Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/47]Johnson, Richard Alan , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
Former [2016/35]Hill, Justin John
Olswang LLP
90 High Holborn
London WC1V 6XX / GB
Application number, filing date14855008.023.10.2014
[2016/35]
WO2014US62066
Priority number, dateUS201361895263P24.10.2013         Original published format: US 201361895263 P
US20131413330218.12.2013         Original published format: US201314133302
[2016/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015061629
Date:30.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3061008
Date:31.08.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.2015
[2016/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3061008
Date:21.11.2018
Language:EN
[2018/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR30.04.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.03.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30
[2016/35]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/35]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:DATENSPEICHERVORRICHTUNG MIT UNTERSTÜTZUNG VON BESCHLEUNIGTEN DATENBANKOPERATIONEN[2016/35]
English:DATA STORAGE DEVICE SUPPORTING ACCELERATED DATABASE OPERATIONS[2016/35]
French:MÉMOIRE DE DONNÉES PRENANT EN CHARGE DES OPÉRATIONS DE BASE DE DONNÉES ACCÉLÉRÉES[2016/35]
Entry into regional phase05.04.2016National basic fee paid 
05.04.2016Search fee paid 
05.04.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
05.04.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.04.2016Examination requested  [2016/35]
30.10.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.05.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.09.2018Fee for grant paid
13.09.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.09.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)22.08.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
11.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
11.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL21.11.2018
AT21.11.2018
CZ21.11.2018
DK21.11.2018
EE21.11.2018
ES21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
HR21.11.2018
IT21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
NL21.11.2018
PL21.11.2018
RO21.11.2018
RS21.11.2018
SE21.11.2018
SI21.11.2018
SK21.11.2018
SM21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
NO21.02.2019
GR22.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
PT21.03.2019
[2019/50]
Former [2019/40]AL21.11.2018
AT21.11.2018
CZ21.11.2018
DK21.11.2018
EE21.11.2018
ES21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
HR21.11.2018
IT21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
NL21.11.2018
PL21.11.2018
RO21.11.2018
RS21.11.2018
SE21.11.2018
SK21.11.2018
SM21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
NO21.02.2019
GR22.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
PT21.03.2019
Former [2019/37]AL21.11.2018
AT21.11.2018
CZ21.11.2018
DK21.11.2018
EE21.11.2018
ES21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
HR21.11.2018
IT21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
NL21.11.2018
PL21.11.2018
RO21.11.2018
RS21.11.2018
SE21.11.2018
SM21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
NO21.02.2019
GR22.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
PT21.03.2019
Former [2019/35]AL21.11.2018
AT21.11.2018
CZ21.11.2018
DK21.11.2018
ES21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
HR21.11.2018
IT21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
NL21.11.2018
PL21.11.2018
RS21.11.2018
SE21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
NO21.02.2019
GR22.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
PT21.03.2019
Former [2019/34]AL21.11.2018
AT21.11.2018
DK21.11.2018
ES21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
HR21.11.2018
IT21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
NL21.11.2018
RS21.11.2018
SE21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
NO21.02.2019
GR22.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
PT21.03.2019
Former [2019/26]AL21.11.2018
AT21.11.2018
ES21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
HR21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
NL21.11.2018
RS21.11.2018
SE21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
NO21.02.2019
GR22.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
PT21.03.2019
Former [2019/25]AT21.11.2018
ES21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
HR21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
NL21.11.2018
RS21.11.2018
SE21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
NO21.02.2019
GR22.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
Former [2019/24]AT21.11.2018
ES21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
HR21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
NL21.11.2018
SE21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
NO21.02.2019
GR22.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
Former [2019/23]AT21.11.2018
ES21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
HR21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
NL21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
NO21.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
Former [2019/22]FI21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
NO21.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
Former [2019/21]FI21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
NO21.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
Former [2019/20]LT21.11.2018
NO21.02.2019
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2008070173  (FLYNN DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 9 - page 11 * * page 20, line 28 - page 24, line 27 *;
 [A]US2012158753  (HE RAY C [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0049] *;
 [A]US2013227236  (FLYNN DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6070170  (FRISKE CRAIG ALAN [US], et al) [A] 1,9 * column 5, line 49 - line 63 *;
 [A]EP2541423  (SAP AG [DE]) [A] 1,9 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0028] *
 [A]  - P. BONCZ, "MonetDB/XQuery: A fast Xquery processor powered by a relational engine", ACM, 2 PENN PLAZA, SUITE 701 - NEW YORK USA, (20060627), pages 479 - 490, XP040042460 [A] 1,9 * paragraph [0005] *
International search[A]US2002116457  (ESHLEMAN JOHN [US], et al);
 [A]US6549977  (HORST ROBERT W [US], et al);
 [A]US2011296440  (LAURICH LAWRENCE A [US], et al);
 [A]US2012221534  (GAO YING MING [CN], et al);
 [A]US2006143238  (TAMATSU MASAHARU [JP])
by applicantWO2008070173