Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3061626

EP3061626 - NON-PNEUMATIC TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  31.05.2019
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.01.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  28.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip31.05.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 03.07.2019  [2019/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
[2016/35]
Inventor(s)01 / NISHIDA Masashi
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
Technical Center
3-1-1 Ogawahigashi-cho
Kodaira-shi Tokyo 187-8531 / JP
02 / ABE Akihiko
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
Technical Center
3-1-1 Ogawahigashi-cho
Kodaira-shi Tokyo 187-8531 / JP
 [2016/35]
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[2019/27]
Former [2016/35]Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date14856704.311.09.2014
[2016/35]
WO2014JP74124
Priority number, dateJP2013021949422.10.2013         Original published format: JP 2013219494
[2016/35]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015060035
Date:30.04.2015
Language:JA
[2015/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3061626
Date:31.08.2016
Language:EN
[2016/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3061626
Date:03.07.2019
Language:EN
[2019/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP30.04.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.10.2016
ClassificationInternational:B60C7/00, B60B9/04, B60C7/10, B60C7/24, B60C7/12, B60C7/14, B60C7/18, B60B25/00, B60B1/14, B60B5/02, B29D30/02
[2016/46]
Former International [2016/35]B60C7/00, B60B9/04, B60C7/10, B60C7/24
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/35]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:LUFTLOSER REIFEN[2016/35]
English:NON-PNEUMATIC TIRE[2016/35]
French:PNEU NON PNEUMATIQUE[2016/35]
Entry into regional phase18.04.2016Translation filed 
18.04.2016National basic fee paid 
18.04.2016Search fee paid 
18.04.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
18.04.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.04.2016Examination requested  [2016/35]
11.05.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.12.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.12.2018Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 31.01.2019
23.01.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.01.2019Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
23.05.2019Fee for grant paid
23.05.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.05.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
26.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
25.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XI]DE2944150  (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * page 1 - page 5; figures 2-3 * [I] 3;
 [XY]JPS5836702  (OHTSU TIRE) [X] 1,2,4,5 * abstract * [Y] 3;
 [X]JP2005247305  (FUKUYAMA RUBBER IND CO LTD, et al) [X] 1,2,4,5 * abstract *;
 [X]JP2007331708  (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [X] 1,4 * abstract *;
 [X]WO0076789  (BURNS ALAN ROBERT [AU]) [X] 1,4 * page 9 - page 13; figures 1-7 *;
 [Y]JPH10236217  (FUKUYAMA RUBBER IND KK, et al) [Y] 1,2,4,5 * abstract *;
 [Y]JPH03182809  (KANETSUU ENG KK) [Y] 1,2,4,5 * abstract *;
 [YA]US2896687  (SMITH CORNELIUS W, et al) [Y] 3 * the whole document * [A] 1,2,4,5;
 [A]US2709471  (SMITH CORNELIUS W, et al) [A] 1,2,4,5 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE2014264  (LÜDTKE, FRIEDRICH) [A] 1,2,4,5 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5762405  (DEMPSEY DOUGLAS E [US]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [AD]JP2013086712  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [AD] 1-5 * figure - *
International search[X]JPS5836702  (THE OHTSU TIRE & RUBBER CO., LTD.);
 [X]JPH03182809  (KANETSU ENGINEERING KABUSHIKI KAISHA);
 [A]JPS60236803  (UNIROYAL, INC.);
 [A]JP2013086712  (BRIDGESTONE CORP.)
ExaminationEP2177375
 JP2013079037
by applicantJP2013086712