Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3063648

EP3063648 - EXTENSIBLE FRAMEWORK FOR COMMUNICATING OVER A FIRE WALL WITH A SOFTWARE APPLICATION REGARDING A USER ACCOUNT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.07.2019
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.03.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
26.07.2019Change - applicantpublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Okta, Inc.
100 First Street, Suite 600
San Francisco, CA 94105 / US
[2019/35]
Former [2016/36]For all designated states
Okta, Inc.
301 Brannan Street, 3rd Floor
San Francisco, CA 94107 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BARBARA, Christopher
c/o Okta Inc.
301 Brannan Street
3rd Floor
San Francisco, CA 94107 / US
02 / PAMIDIMARRI, Raghuram
c/o Okta Inc.
301 Brannan Street
3rd Floor
San Francisco, CA 94107 / US
 [2016/36]
Representative(s)Prock, Thomas
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[2019/35]
Former [2016/36]Prock, Thomas
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date14858589.610.09.2014
[2016/36]
WO2014US54912
Priority number, dateUS201361899103P01.11.2013         Original published format: US 201361899103 P
US20131409601104.12.2013         Original published format: US201314096011
[2016/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015065594
Date:07.05.2015
Language:EN
[2015/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3063648
Date:07.09.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2015
[2016/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3063648
Date:28.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US07.05.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.08.2016
ClassificationInternational:G06F15/173, G06F9/54, // H04L29/06, H04L29/08
[2016/36]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/36]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ERWEITERBARES RAHMENWERK ZUR KOMMUNIKATION ÜBER EINE FIREWALL MIT EINER SOFTWAREANWENDUNG BEZÜGLICH EINES BENUTZERKONTOS[2016/36]
English:EXTENSIBLE FRAMEWORK FOR COMMUNICATING OVER A FIRE WALL WITH A SOFTWARE APPLICATION REGARDING A USER ACCOUNT[2016/36]
French:INFRASTRUCTURE EXTENSIBLE POUR UNE COMMUNICATION PAR UNE BARRIÈRE DE SÉCURITÉ AVEC UNE APPLICATION LOGICIELLE CONCERNANT UN COMPTE D'UTILISATEUR[2016/36]
Entry into regional phase16.05.2016National basic fee paid 
16.05.2016Search fee paid 
16.05.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
16.05.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.05.2016Examination requested  [2016/36]
02.03.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.08.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.03.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
08.06.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.03.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.07.2019Fee for grant paid
18.07.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.07.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
08.06.2018Request for further processing filed
08.06.2018Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
18.06.2018Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
27.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO02073339  (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,5,8-10,12,14,15 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0075] * * figures 9,12 * [I] 3,4,6,7,11,13;
 [I]US2007245013  (SARASWATHY ANIL [IN], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0073] * * paragraph [0096] - paragraph [0099]; figures 7,5 * * paragraph [0103] - paragraph [0104] * * paragraph [0149] * * paragraph [0130] - paragraph [0134] *;
 [I]US7735127  (RIVE RUSSELL S [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * column 9, line 12 - column 10, line 55; figure 5 *;
 [A]US2009158302  (NICODEMUS BLAIR [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0037]; figures 1,3 *
International search[Y]US2007245013  (SARASWATHY ANIL [IN], et al);
 [Y]US2009158302  (NICODEMUS BLAIR [US], et al);
 [Y]  - T. DRAKE ET AL., "System for ''Cross-Domain Identity Management:Protocol 1.1 draft-scim-api- 01", (201208), URL: http://tools.ietf.org/pdf/draft-ietf-scim-api-00.pdf, (20141029), XP055280144
by applicantWO02073339
 US2007245013
 US7735127