blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3070126

EP3070126 - AROMATIC POLYCARBONATE RESIN MOLDING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.04.2020
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  09.12.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.03.2024Change: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure 
29.03.2024New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Idemitsu Kosan Co., Ltd.
1-1, Marunouchi 3-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8321 / JP
[2016/38]
Inventor(s)01 / TAKIMOTO, Masami
1-1 Anesakikaigan
Ichihara-shi Chiba 299-0193 / JP
02 / TORII, Takahiro
1-1 Anesakikaigan
Ichihara-shi Chiba 299-0193 / JP
03 / NAKAE, Mitsugu
1-1 Anesakikaigan
Ichihara-shi Chiba 299-0193 / JP
 [2016/38]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2016/38]
Application number, filing date14860471.310.11.2014
[2016/38]
WO2014JP79764
Priority number, dateJP2013023343111.11.2013         Original published format: JP 2013233431
[2016/38]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2015068844
Date:14.05.2015
Language:JA
[2015/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3070126
Date:21.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3070126
Date:06.05.2020
Language:EN
[2020/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP14.05.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.05.2017
ClassificationIPC:C08L69/00, C08K5/42, C08K5/55, C08L71/02, G02B6/00
[2017/26]
CPC:
C08L69/00 (EP,KR,US); C08G64/06 (US); C08J5/00 (KR);
C08K3/38 (KR); C08K5/41 (US); C08K5/42 (KR);
C08K5/55 (KR,US); C08L71/02 (EP,KR,US); G02B6/00 (KR);
G02B6/0065 (US); G02B6/10 (KR) (-)
C-Set:
C08K3/38, C08L69/00 (US,EP);
C08K5/42, C08L69/00 (EP,US);
C08L69/00, C08L71/02 (US,EP)
Former IPC [2016/38]C08L69/00, C08K5/42, C08K5/55, C08L71/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/38]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:FORMUNG AROMATISCHER POLYCARBONATHARZE[2016/38]
English:AROMATIC POLYCARBONATE RESIN MOLDING[2016/38]
French:MOULAGE DE RÉSINE POLYCARBONATE AROMATIQUE[2016/38]
Entry into regional phase02.05.2016Translation filed 
02.05.2016National basic fee paid 
02.05.2016Search fee paid 
02.05.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
02.05.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.05.2016Examination requested  [2016/38]
13.12.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.06.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.11.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.12.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.01.2019Observations by third parties
15.02.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.04.2019Observations by third parties
14.05.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.09.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.12.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.03.2020Fee for grant paid
25.03.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.03.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  05.02.2021  10.02.2021  ADMISSIBLE
SABIC Global Technologies B.V.
Plasticslaan 1
4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL
Opponent's representative
Sabic Intellectual Property Group
Sabic Intellectual Property Department
P.O. Box 3008
6160 GA Geleen / NL
 [2021/11]
23.02.2021Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
02.07.2021Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
17.05.2022Date of oral proceedings
15.06.2022Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
15.06.2022Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition04.08.2022Appeal received No.  T1891/22
04.08.2022Payment of appeal fee
21.10.2022Statement of grounds filed
27.03.2024Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
27.03.2024Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
24.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
22.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
26.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU10.11.2014
AL06.05.2020
AT06.05.2020
CY06.05.2020
CZ06.05.2020
DK06.05.2020
EE06.05.2020
ES06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
IT06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
MC06.05.2020
MK06.05.2020
MT06.05.2020
NL06.05.2020
PL06.05.2020
RO06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
SI06.05.2020
SK06.05.2020
SM06.05.2020
TR06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
PT07.09.2020
GB10.11.2020
IE10.11.2020
LU10.11.2020
BE30.11.2020
CH30.11.2020
FR30.11.2020
LI30.11.2020
IS22.12.2021
[2022/33]
Former [2022/32]HU10.11.2014
AL06.05.2020
AT06.05.2020
CY06.05.2020
CZ06.05.2020
DK06.05.2020
EE06.05.2020
ES06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
IT06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
MC06.05.2020
MK06.05.2020
MT06.05.2020
NL06.05.2020
PL06.05.2020
RO06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
SI06.05.2020
SK06.05.2020
SM06.05.2020
TR06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
PT07.09.2020
GB10.11.2020
IE10.11.2020
LU10.11.2020
CH30.11.2020
FR30.11.2020
LI30.11.2020
IS22.12.2021
Former [2022/27]HU10.11.2014
AL06.05.2020
AT06.05.2020
CY06.05.2020
CZ06.05.2020
DK06.05.2020
EE06.05.2020
ES06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
IT06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
MC06.05.2020
MT06.05.2020
NL06.05.2020
PL06.05.2020
RO06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
SI06.05.2020
SK06.05.2020
SM06.05.2020
TR06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
PT07.09.2020
GB10.11.2020
IE10.11.2020
LU10.11.2020
CH30.11.2020
FR30.11.2020
LI30.11.2020
IS22.12.2021
Former [2022/10]AL06.05.2020
AT06.05.2020
CZ06.05.2020
DK06.05.2020
EE06.05.2020
ES06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
IT06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
MC06.05.2020
NL06.05.2020
PL06.05.2020
RO06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
SI06.05.2020
SK06.05.2020
SM06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
PT07.09.2020
GB10.11.2020
IE10.11.2020
LU10.11.2020
CH30.11.2020
FR30.11.2020
LI30.11.2020
IS22.12.2021
Former [2021/49]AL06.05.2020
AT06.05.2020
CZ06.05.2020
DK06.05.2020
EE06.05.2020
ES06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
IT06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
MC06.05.2020
NL06.05.2020
PL06.05.2020
RO06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
SI06.05.2020
SK06.05.2020
SM06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
GB10.11.2020
IE10.11.2020
LU10.11.2020
CH30.11.2020
FR30.11.2020
LI30.11.2020
Former [2021/48]AL06.05.2020
AT06.05.2020
CZ06.05.2020
DK06.05.2020
EE06.05.2020
ES06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
IT06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
MC06.05.2020
NL06.05.2020
PL06.05.2020
RO06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
SI06.05.2020
SK06.05.2020
SM06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
IE10.11.2020
LU10.11.2020
CH30.11.2020
FR30.11.2020
LI30.11.2020
Former [2021/46]AL06.05.2020
AT06.05.2020
CZ06.05.2020
DK06.05.2020
EE06.05.2020
ES06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
IT06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
MC06.05.2020
NL06.05.2020
PL06.05.2020
RO06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
SI06.05.2020
SK06.05.2020
SM06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
IE10.11.2020
LU10.11.2020
CH30.11.2020
LI30.11.2020
Former [2021/37]AL06.05.2020
AT06.05.2020
CZ06.05.2020
DK06.05.2020
EE06.05.2020
ES06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
IT06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
MC06.05.2020
NL06.05.2020
PL06.05.2020
RO06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
SI06.05.2020
SK06.05.2020
SM06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
LU10.11.2020
CH30.11.2020
LI30.11.2020
Former [2021/33]AL06.05.2020
AT06.05.2020
CZ06.05.2020
DK06.05.2020
EE06.05.2020
ES06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
IT06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
MC06.05.2020
NL06.05.2020
PL06.05.2020
RO06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
SI06.05.2020
SK06.05.2020
SM06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
LU10.11.2020
Former [2021/31]AL06.05.2020
AT06.05.2020
CZ06.05.2020
DK06.05.2020
EE06.05.2020
ES06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
IT06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
MC06.05.2020
NL06.05.2020
PL06.05.2020
RO06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
SI06.05.2020
SK06.05.2020
SM06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2021/24]AL06.05.2020
AT06.05.2020
CZ06.05.2020
DK06.05.2020
EE06.05.2020
ES06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
IT06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
NL06.05.2020
PL06.05.2020
RO06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
SI06.05.2020
SK06.05.2020
SM06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2021/10]AL06.05.2020
AT06.05.2020
CZ06.05.2020
DK06.05.2020
EE06.05.2020
ES06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
IT06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
NL06.05.2020
PL06.05.2020
RO06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
SK06.05.2020
SM06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2021/09]AL06.05.2020
AT06.05.2020
CZ06.05.2020
DK06.05.2020
EE06.05.2020
ES06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
IT06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
NL06.05.2020
RO06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
SM06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2021/08]AL06.05.2020
DK06.05.2020
ES06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
NL06.05.2020
RO06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
SM06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2021/04]AL06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
NL06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2021/01]FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2020/51]FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2020/50]FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2020/48]FI06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
NO06.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2020/47]LT06.05.2020
NO06.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
Former [2020/46]IS06.09.2020
Documents cited:Search[XY]JPH0827263  (DAICEL CHEM) [X] 1-3,5,6,8-10 * the whole document * [Y] 4,7;
 [A]EP1970410  (MITSUBISHI ENG PLASTICS CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-10* paragraphs [0001] , [0004] , [0009] , [0011]; tables 3-4 *;
 [YD]WO2013088796  (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP], et al) [YD] 4,7 * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] , [0005] , [0097] *
International search[A]JP2006169451  (MITSUBISHI ENG PLASTICS CORP);
 [A]JP2007204737  (MITSUBISHI ENG PLASTICS CORP);
 [A]JP2008163070  (SUMITOMO DOW LTD);
 [A]WO2013088796  (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP], et al);
 [A]JP2013139097  (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO);
 [AP]JP2013231899  (MITSUBISHI ENG PLASTICS CORP)
by applicantJPH0469364B
 JP2002060609
 JP2004018406
 WO2011083635
 WO2013088796
otherJP2015093914
    - "Mechanisms of Thermal and Photodegradations of Bisphenol A Polycarbonate", Clough et al, Polymer Durability Advances in Chemistry, American Chemical Society, (19960000), pages 59 - 76, XP055551658
OppositionUS5274009
 US5276109
 EP0640646
 JPH0827263
 EP0753540
 US2005288407
 US7071284
 US2009162628
 EP2522697
 EP2799200
    - Arnold Factor, "Mechanisms of Thermal and Photodegradations of Bisphenol A Polycarbonate", Polymer Dusabiuty, (19960505), pages 60 - 75, XP055551658
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.