Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3067705

EP3067705 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETECTING ELECTRONIC DEVICE CONNECTED TO SMART PLUG [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  12.08.2016
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.11.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
[2016/37]
Inventor(s)01 / PARK, YoungJin
No.606-1303
32 Beoman-ro 95beon-gil
Sosa-gu
Bucheon-si, Gyeonggi-do422-753 / KR
 [2017/10]
Former [2016/37]01 / PARK, YoungJin
No.606-1303
32 Beoman-ro 95beon-gil
Sosa-gu
Bucheon-si Gyeonggi-do422-753 / KR
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/37]Jenkins, Richard Gavin , et al
HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
Application number, filing date14860656.904.11.2014
[2016/37]
WO2014KR10529
Priority number, dateKR2013013453707.11.2013         Original published format: KR 20130134537
KR2013014905203.12.2013         Original published format: KR 20130149052
[2016/37]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015069007
Date:14.05.2015
Language:KO
[2015/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3067705
Date:14.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR14.05.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.04.2017
ClassificationInternational:G01R31/00, G01R21/00, G06Q50/06
[2017/21]
Former International [2016/37]G01R31/00, G01R21/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/37]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERKENNUNG VON MIT EINEM INTELLIGENTEN STECKER VERBUNDENEN ELEKTRONISCHEN VORRICHTUNGEN[2016/37]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETECTING ELECTRONIC DEVICE CONNECTED TO SMART PLUG[2016/37]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE DÉTECTION DE DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE CONNECTÉ À UNE FICHE INTELLIGENTE[2016/37]
Entry into regional phase30.03.2016Translation filed 
30.03.2016National basic fee paid 
30.03.2016Search fee paid 
30.03.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
30.03.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.03.2016Examination requested  [2016/37]
25.08.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
13.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
23.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
22.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[I]US2010109619  (TSOU YU-PING [TW], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0048] *;
 [I]US2010211509  (JACOBS RICHARD B [US]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0057] *;
 [I]US2013274943  (NOJIMA MITSUNORI [JP], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0108] - paragraph [0109] * * paragraph [0126] - paragraph [0127] * * paragraph [0130] - paragraph [0131] *;
 [I]WO0241585  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [I] 1-15 * page 2, line 3 - page 3, line 5 * * page 4, line 18 - page 5, line 30 * * page 9, line 16 - page 10, line 10 * * page 10, line 32 - page 11, line 6 *;
 [I]US2011004421  (ROSEWELL NEIL ALEXANDER [GB], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0080] * * paragraph [0106] - paragraph [0108] * * paragraph [0117] - paragraph [0122] *;
 [I]WO2013022035  (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]US2011304205  (LEE YU-LUNG [TW]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0014] *
International search[Y]JP2008306840  (KONICA MINOLTA HOLDINGS INC.);
 [Y]KR20130073788  (KT CORPORATION);
 [A]US2010109619  (TSOU ET AL.);
 [A]KR20110057865  (SK TELECOM CO., LTD.);
 [A]JP2006135685  (NIPPON TELEGR & TELEPH CORP )