Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3069897

EP3069897 - NON-PNEUMATIC TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.10.2019
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.12.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.06.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 11.12.2019  [2019/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
[2016/38]
Inventor(s)01 / ABE, Akihiko
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
Technical Center
3-1-1 Ogawahigashi-cho
Kodaira-shi, Tokyo 187-8531 / JP
 [2016/38]
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/38]Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date14861917.424.10.2014
[2016/38]
WO2014JP78392
Priority number, dateJP2013023691415.11.2013         Original published format: JP 2013236914
[2016/38]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015072314
Date:21.05.2015
Language:JA
[2015/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3069897
Date:21.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3069897
Date:05.12.2018
Language:EN
[2018/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP21.05.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.10.2016
ClassificationInternational:B60C7/18, B60B9/26, B60C7/14, B60B9/04, B60B9/08, B60C7/10, B60B5/02
[2016/47]
Former International [2016/38]B60B9/04, B60C7/18
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/38]
TitleGerman:LUFTLOSER REIFEN[2016/38]
English:NON-PNEUMATIC TIRE[2016/38]
French:PNEU NON PNEUMATIQUE[2016/38]
Entry into regional phase03.05.2016Translation filed 
03.05.2016National basic fee paid 
03.05.2016Search fee paid 
03.05.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
03.05.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.05.2016Examination requested  [2016/38]
11.05.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.09.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.01.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.06.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.10.2018Fee for grant paid
08.10.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.10.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)06.09.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
25.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
24.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL05.12.2018
AT05.12.2018
CZ05.12.2018
DK05.12.2018
EE05.12.2018
ES05.12.2018
FI05.12.2018
HR05.12.2018
IT05.12.2018
LT05.12.2018
LV05.12.2018
NL05.12.2018
PL05.12.2018
RO05.12.2018
RS05.12.2018
SE05.12.2018
SI05.12.2018
SK05.12.2018
SM05.12.2018
BG05.03.2019
NO05.03.2019
GR06.03.2019
IS05.04.2019
PT05.04.2019
[2019/50]
Former [2019/48]AL05.12.2018
AT05.12.2018
CZ05.12.2018
DK05.12.2018
EE05.12.2018
ES05.12.2018
FI05.12.2018
HR05.12.2018
IT05.12.2018
LT05.12.2018
LV05.12.2018
NL05.12.2018
PL05.12.2018
RO05.12.2018
RS05.12.2018
SE05.12.2018
SK05.12.2018
SM05.12.2018
BG05.03.2019
NO05.03.2019
GR06.03.2019
IS05.04.2019
PT05.04.2019
Former [2019/39]AL05.12.2018
AT05.12.2018
CZ05.12.2018
EE05.12.2018
ES05.12.2018
FI05.12.2018
HR05.12.2018
IT05.12.2018
LT05.12.2018
LV05.12.2018
NL05.12.2018
PL05.12.2018
RO05.12.2018
RS05.12.2018
SE05.12.2018
SK05.12.2018
SM05.12.2018
BG05.03.2019
NO05.03.2019
GR06.03.2019
IS05.04.2019
PT05.04.2019
Former [2019/37]AL05.12.2018
AT05.12.2018
CZ05.12.2018
EE05.12.2018
ES05.12.2018
FI05.12.2018
HR05.12.2018
IT05.12.2018
LT05.12.2018
LV05.12.2018
NL05.12.2018
PL05.12.2018
RO05.12.2018
RS05.12.2018
SE05.12.2018
SM05.12.2018
BG05.03.2019
NO05.03.2019
GR06.03.2019
PT05.04.2019
Former [2019/35]AL05.12.2018
AT05.12.2018
CZ05.12.2018
ES05.12.2018
FI05.12.2018
HR05.12.2018
IT05.12.2018
LT05.12.2018
LV05.12.2018
NL05.12.2018
PL05.12.2018
RS05.12.2018
SE05.12.2018
BG05.03.2019
NO05.03.2019
GR06.03.2019
PT05.04.2019
Former [2019/34]AL05.12.2018
AT05.12.2018
ES05.12.2018
FI05.12.2018
HR05.12.2018
IT05.12.2018
LT05.12.2018
LV05.12.2018
NL05.12.2018
RS05.12.2018
SE05.12.2018
BG05.03.2019
NO05.03.2019
GR06.03.2019
PT05.04.2019
Former [2019/33]AL05.12.2018
AT05.12.2018
ES05.12.2018
FI05.12.2018
HR05.12.2018
LT05.12.2018
LV05.12.2018
NL05.12.2018
RS05.12.2018
SE05.12.2018
BG05.03.2019
NO05.03.2019
GR06.03.2019
PT05.04.2019
Former [2019/30]AL05.12.2018
AT05.12.2018
ES05.12.2018
FI05.12.2018
HR05.12.2018
LT05.12.2018
LV05.12.2018
NL05.12.2018
RS05.12.2018
SE05.12.2018
BG05.03.2019
NO05.03.2019
GR06.03.2019
Former [2019/26]AL05.12.2018
AT05.12.2018
ES05.12.2018
FI05.12.2018
HR05.12.2018
LT05.12.2018
LV05.12.2018
RS05.12.2018
SE05.12.2018
BG05.03.2019
NO05.03.2019
GR06.03.2019
Former [2019/25]AT05.12.2018
ES05.12.2018
FI05.12.2018
HR05.12.2018
LT05.12.2018
LV05.12.2018
RS05.12.2018
SE05.12.2018
BG05.03.2019
NO05.03.2019
GR06.03.2019
Former [2019/24]AT05.12.2018
ES05.12.2018
FI05.12.2018
HR05.12.2018
LT05.12.2018
LV05.12.2018
SE05.12.2018
BG05.03.2019
NO05.03.2019
GR06.03.2019
Former [2019/23]AT05.12.2018
ES05.12.2018
FI05.12.2018
HR05.12.2018
LT05.12.2018
LV05.12.2018
BG05.03.2019
NO05.03.2019
Former [2019/22]FI05.12.2018
LT05.12.2018
BG05.03.2019
NO05.03.2019
Former [2019/21]FI05.12.2018
LT05.12.2018
NO05.03.2019
Former [2019/20]LT05.12.2018
NO05.03.2019
Documents cited:Search[XDA]JP2013086712  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [XD] 1 * figure - * [A] 2-5;
 [XA]US976938  (SIMPSON SELDEN L [US]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-5;
 [XA]US1263513  (BEM JOSEPH P [US]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-5;
 [E]EP3056354  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [E] 1-5 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0086]; figures 1-6 *;
 [E]EP2915681  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [E] 1 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0089]; figures 1-4,5A,6A *
International search[X]JP2013199274  (BRIDGESTONE CORP);
 [X]JP2013163520  (BRIDGESTONE CORP);
 [Y]JP2011156906  (BRIDGESTONE CORP)
by applicantJP2013086712