Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3083498

EP3083498 - METHOD FOR PREPARING SIOX HAVING A NANOMETRIC FILAMENT STRUCTURE, AND USE THEREOF AS A LITHIUM-ION BATTERY ANODE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  10.08.2018
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HYDRO-QUEBEC
75 René-Lévesque Ouest, 22e étage
Montréal, Québec H2Z 1A4 / CA
[2016/43]
Inventor(s)01 / LEBLANC, Dominic
2395 Av. du Sagittaire
Gentilly, Québec G9H 4J4 / CA
02 / GUERFI, Abdelbast
8655 Boul. Rivard
Brossard, Québec J4X 1W2 / CA
03 / ZAGHIB, Karim
2006 Rue Marcelle Ferron
Longueuil, Québec J4N 1T8 / CA
04 / HOVINGTON, Pierre
1006 Emile-Nelligan
Boucherville, Québec J4B 2L4 / CA
05 / TROTTIER, Julie
17700 Notre-Dame
Mirabel, Québec J7J 2J4 / CA
 [2016/43]
Representative(s)Lang, Johannes
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[2016/43]
Application number, filing date14865311.628.11.2014
[2016/43]
WO2014CA51141
Priority number, dateCA2013283558328.11.2013         Original published format: CA 2835583
[2016/43]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015077892
Date:04.06.2015
Language:FR
[2015/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3083498
Date:26.10.2016
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.2015
[2016/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CA04.06.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.08.2017
ClassificationInternational:C01B33/113, H01M4/136, H01M4/58, H01M4/485
[2017/20]
Former International [2016/43]C01B33/113, H01M4/136, H01M4/58
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/43]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SIOX MIT EINER NANOMETRISCHEN FILAMENTSTRUKTUR UND VERWENDUNG DAVON ALS EIN ANODENMATERIAL EINER LITHIUM-IONEN-BATTERIE[2016/43]
English:METHOD FOR PREPARING SIOX HAVING A NANOMETRIC FILAMENT STRUCTURE, AND USE THEREOF AS A LITHIUM-ION BATTERY ANODE MATERIAL[2016/43]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE SIOX À STRUCTURE FILAMENTAIRE NANOMÉTRIQUE ET SON UTILISATION COMME MATÉRIAU D'ANODE DE BATTERIE LITHIUM-ION[2016/43]
Entry into regional phase30.05.2016National basic fee paid 
30.05.2016Search fee paid 
30.05.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
30.05.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.05.2016Examination requested  [2016/43]
28.02.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.08.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.02.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
22.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
22.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
20.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP1236682  (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1,3,5,6,12-16 * claims 1,2,4 * * paragraphs [0015] - [0019] - [ 0024] * * examples 1-4 * [Y] 2,4,7;
 [Y]EP0216649  (KAWASAKI STEEL CO [JP]) [Y] 2,4,7 * abstract * * page 2, line 32 - page 5, line 16 * * page 10, line 13 - line 16 *;
 [I]US2001012503  (FUKUOKA HIROFUMI [JP], et al) [I] 8,10 * claims 1-3 * * paragraphs [0009] , [ 0024] *;
 [X]US2823979  (SEARS DANIEL S) [X] 9,11-14 * page 2, line 11 - page 3, line 33 * * figure *;
 [A]US2001018037  (FUKUOKA HIROFUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1,12-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0017] * * example 1 *;
 [XAI]  - CHAN-OK JUNG ET AL, "Synthesis of SiOx powder using DC arc plasma", JOURNAL OF NANOSCIENCE AND NANOTECHNOLOGY AMERICAN SCIENTIFIC PUBLISHERS USA, (201302), vol. 13, no. 2, ISSN 1533-4880, pages 1153 - 1158, XP008183922 [X] 1,12-16 * abstract * * page 1153, colonne de gauche, 1er paragraphe * * page 1154, colonne de droite, "3. Results and discussion" * * figures 3a, 4 * * page 1156, colonne de gauche * * page 1157, colonne de droite, "4. Conclusions" * [A] 2,3,5-7 [I] 4,8,10

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1166/jnn.2013.6035
 [A]  - PEI L. Z., "Silicon oxide nanowires and spheres grown by hydrothermal deposition", MATERIALS SCIENCE WYDAWNICTWO POLITECHNIKI WROCLAWSKIEJ POLAND, (2009), vol. 27, no. 1, ISSN 0137-1339, pages 339 - 347, XP008183921 [A] 1,12,13 * abstract * * page 340, "2. Experimental" * * page 341, figure 1 *
 [A]  - KOMAROV S V ET AL, "Formation of SiO and related Si-based materials through carbothermic reduction of silica-containing slag", MATERIALS TRANSACTIONS JAPAN INST. METALS JAPAN, (200504), vol. 46, no. 4, ISSN 1345-9678, pages 827 - 834, XP002768706 [A] 1,2,12-14 * abstract * * page 829, "3.2. Location of silicon suboxide deposition" * * pages 830-831, "Deposit morphology" *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2320/matertrans.46.827
International search[X]JP2013180935  (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP);
 [X]WO2013054476  (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]);
 [X]WO03068868  (CIBA SC HOLDING AG [CH], et al);
 [X]KR20120089073  (INHA IND PARTNERSHIP INST [KR]);
 [AP]WO2014126272  (KOREA ENERGY RESEARCH INST [KR]);
 [A]EP1363341  (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]);
 [A]US2012251710  (JANG BO-YUN [KR], et al);
 [AP]  - LAMONTAGNE ET AL., "Synthesis of silicon nanowires from carbothermic reduction of silica fume in RF thermal plasma.", PHYSICA STATUS SOLIDI (A), (2014), vol. 211, no. 7, pages 1610 - 1616, XP055345911

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/pssa.201431033