Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3084574

EP3084574 - DISPLAY APPARATUS AND METHOD OF DISPLAYING IMAGE BY DISPLAY APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  28.08.2019
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.11.2019New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2016/43]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / SEONG, Young-ah
244-3103 135 Olympic-ro
Songpa-gu
Seoul 138-911 / KR
02 / MIN, Chan-hong
1413-303 6 Dongcheon-ro 153beon-gil
Suji-gu
Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 448-914 / KR
03 / YANG, Pil-seung
605-912 210 Godeok-ro
Gangdong-gu
Seoul 134-782 / KR
04 / JANG, Say
208-1902 100 Giheung-ro 116beon-gil
Giheung-gu
Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-792 / KR
05 / KANG, Jae-eun
203-1402 25 Gwonseon-ro 694beon-gil
Gwonseon-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 441-737 / KR
06 / LIM, Yong-hyun
7-103 219 Ingye-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-718 / KR
 [2016/43]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/43]Jenkins, Richard Gavin
HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
Application number, filing date14871617.816.12.2014
[2016/43]
WO2014KR12372
Priority number, dateKR2013015969319.12.2013         Original published format: KR 20130159693
KR2014008266402.07.2014         Original published format: KR 20140082664
[2016/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015093806
Date:25.06.2015
Language:EN
[2015/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3084574
Date:26.10.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2015
[2016/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR25.06.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.08.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/048, G06F3/14, G06F3/0488, G06F3/0484, G06F3/042
[2017/36]
Former International [2016/43]G06F3/048, G06F3/14
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/43]
TitleGerman:ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ANZEIGE EINES BILDES DURCH DIE ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG[2016/43]
English:DISPLAY APPARATUS AND METHOD OF DISPLAYING IMAGE BY DISPLAY APPARATUS[2016/43]
French:APPAREIL D'AFFICHAGE ET PROCÉDÉ D'AFFICHAGE D'IMAGE PAR CET APPAREIL D'AFFICHAGE[2016/43]
Entry into regional phase15.07.2016National basic fee paid 
15.07.2016Search fee paid 
15.07.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
15.07.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.07.2016Examination requested  [2016/43]
04.12.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.03.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
17.05.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.08.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.11.2019Fee for grant paid
01.11.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.11.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
18.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
21.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2012218208  (SATO TAKAYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-7,10,11,13-15 * paragraphs [0022] - [0027] - [0 35] - [0042] - [0 47] - [0075]; figures 1-9 * [I] 8,9,12;
 [I]WO2012120978  (UNIV OSAKA [JP], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]US2013194269  (MATAS MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0030] - [0040]; figures 1-4 *
International search[A]US2013159915  (SANG TAE KIM ET AL.);
 [A]US2011209098  (KENNETH P. HINCKLEY ET AL.);
 [A]KR20110110944  (KOREA ADVANCED INSTITUTE OF SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY);
 [A]US2012154408  (SHUHEI YUKAWA ET AL.);
 [A]KR20130094573  (KOREA ADVANCED INSTITUTE OF SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY)