Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3094283

EP3094283 - DENTAL SYSTEM FOR DEVELOPING CUSTOM PROSTHESES THROUGH SCANNING OF CODED MEMBERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.04.2019
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.04.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biomet 3i, LLC
4555 Riverside Drive
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410 / US
[2016/47]
Inventor(s)01 / SUTTIN, Zachary B.
10436 Orchid Reserve Drive
West Palm Beach, Florida 33412 / US
02 / TOWSE, Ross W.
1426 Schoolhouse Way
San Marcos, California 92078 / US
03 / WILSON, Gretchen B.
7253 154th Court North
West Palm Beach, Florida 33418 / US
04 / MONTERO, Miguel G.
8055Rose Marie Circle
Boynton Beach, FL 33472 / US
 [2017/11]
Former [2017/04]01 / SUTTIN, Zachary B.
10436 Orchid Reserve Drive
West Palm Beach, Florida 33412 / US
02 / TOWSE, Ross W.
4435 S.W. LaPaloma Drive
Palm City, FL 34990 / US
03 / WILSON, Gretchen B.
7253 154th Court North
West Palm Beach, Florida 33418 / US
04 / MONTERO, Miguel G.
8055Rose Marie Circle
Boynton Beach, FL 33472 / US
Former [2016/47]01 / SUTTIN, Zachary B.
10436 Orchid Reserve Drive
West Palm Beach, Florida 33412 / US
02 / TOWSE, Ross W.
4435 S.W. LaPaloma Drive
Palm City, Florida 34990 / US
03 / WILSON, Gretchen B.
7253 154th Court North
West Palm Beach, Florida 33418 / US
04 / MONTERO, Miguel G.
5364 Cannon Way
West Palm Beach, Florida 33415 / US
Representative(s)Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
[2016/47]
Application number, filing date14872134.304.12.2014
[2016/47]
WO2014US68637
Priority number, dateUS201361918987P20.12.2013         Original published format: US 201361918987 P
US201461991964P12.05.2014         Original published format: US 201461991964 P
[2016/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015094700
Date:25.06.2015
Language:EN
[2015/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3094283
Date:23.11.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2015
[2016/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US25.06.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61C8/00
[2018/04]
Former International [2016/47]A61C11/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/47]
TitleGerman:ZAHNÄRZTLICHES SYSTEM ZUR ENTWICKLUNG VON ANGEPASSTEN PROTHESEN DURCH ABTASTEN VON CODIERTEN ELEMENTEN[2016/47]
English:DENTAL SYSTEM FOR DEVELOPING CUSTOM PROSTHESES THROUGH SCANNING OF CODED MEMBERS[2016/47]
French:SYSTÈME DENTAIRE POUR DÉVELOPPER DES PROTHÈSES SUR MESURE PAR BALAYAGE D'ÉLÉMENTS CODÉS[2016/47]
Entry into regional phase20.07.2016National basic fee paid 
20.07.2016Search fee paid 
20.07.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
20.07.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.07.2016Examination requested  [2016/47]
19.04.2017Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims
08.06.2017Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
19.07.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.02.2019Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01)
04.04.2019Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
07.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2013196290  (HERRINGTON STEPHEN M [US] ET AL) [X] 1-10,12-14 * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0042] * [I] 11,15;
 [XI]US2011200968  (LAIZURE JR ROBERT S [US]) [X] 1,6,10,12-14 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0047] * [I] 11,15;
 [XI]US2002039717  (AMBER JOHN T [US] ET AL) [X] 1,12 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0020] * * figure - * [I] 2-11,13-15;
 [X]US2007281279  (CHANDER VIV [CA]) [X] 1,2,4,11,12 * paragraph [0112] - paragraph [0113] * * figures 1,2 *;
 [XI]KR100755940B  (IMPLANT INNOVATIONS INC) [X] 1-6,10 * the whole document * [I] 7;
 [A]CN103054655  (LIN ZHENYI) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [X]FR2759896  (MARZOUK JEAN [FR]) [X] 1-11 * figure - *
International search[X]US2013196290  (HERRINGTON ET AL);
 [X]US2002039717  (AMBER ET AL);
 [Y]US2012295226  (ROBB ET AL);
 [Y]US2011300509  (DADI)
 [Y]  - HOLLOWAY, ISSAC., "Learning via Sequential Market Entry: Evidence from International Releases of U.S. Movies", (20120918), page 1, URL: http://cms.sem.tsinghua.edu.cn/semcms/res_base/semcms_com_www/upload/article/file/2012 _4/11_8/3wg1h99kyqdx.pdf, (20150401), XP055352293

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jinteco.2016.10.008