Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3085170

EP3085170 - METHOD FOR POWER HEADROOM REPORTING AND DEVICE THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.02.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.02.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.03.2019  [2019/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
128, Yeoui-daero, Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
[2016/43]
Inventor(s)01 / YI, Seungjune
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 137-893 / KR
02 / LEE, Sunyoung
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 137-893 / KR
03 / PARK, Sungjun
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 137-893 / KR
 [2016/43]
Representative(s)Frenkel, Matthias Alexander
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[2016/43]
Application number, filing date14872207.727.11.2014
[2016/43]
WO2014KR11487
Priority number, dateUS201361918679P20.12.2013         Original published format: US 201361918679 P
[2016/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015093747
Date:25.06.2015
Language:EN
[2015/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3085170
Date:26.10.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2015
[2016/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR25.06.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.06.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04W52/36, H04B7/26, H04W52/34
[2017/29]
Former International [2016/43]H04W52/36, H04B7/26
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/43]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ENERGIERESERVEMELDUNG UND VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR[2016/43]
English:METHOD FOR POWER HEADROOM REPORTING AND DEVICE THEREFOR[2016/43]
French:PROCÉDÉ DESTINÉ À L'ÉTABLISSEMENT DE RAPPORTS DE MARGE DE SÉCURITÉ DE PUISSANCE ET DISPOSITIF ASSOCIÉ[2016/43]
Entry into regional phase14.01.2016National basic fee paid 
14.01.2016Search fee paid 
14.01.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
14.01.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.01.2016Examination requested  [2016/43]
24.10.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.11.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.03.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.05.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.10.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/10]
30.10.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2019/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
24.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201805   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2013025562  (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * paragraph [0088] * * paragraph [0194] - paragraph [0195] * * paragraph [0274] - paragraph [0276] * * paragraph [0280] - paragraph [0293] *;
 [X]  - NSN ET AL, "PHR for dual connectivity", vol. RAN WG2, no. San Francisco, USA; 20131111 - 20131115, (20131113), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-134089 PHR FOR DUAL CONNECTIVITY, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN/RAN2/Docs/, (20131113), XP050736888 [X] 1-11 * page 1, line 5 - line 19 *
 [A]  - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA); Medium Access Control (MAC) protocol specification (Release 11)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 36.321, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20130629), vol. RAN WG2, no. V11.3.0, pages 1 - 57, XP050712004 [A] 1-11 * section 6.1.3.6a *
International search[A]JP2013520917  (LG ELECTRONICS INC.);
 [A]KR20120024953  (QUALCOMM INC [US]);
 [A]KR20120016987  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]);
 [A]KR20110137446  (PANTECH CO LTD [KR])
by applicantWO2013025562