Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3085853

EP3085853 - PVC SELF-ADHESIVE FLOORBOARD WITH WATER-RESISTANT GLUE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  28.09.2018
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zhang, Xiaoling
No. 23 Northbound side of North Cuiheng Road
Cuiqiao Village Committees
Henglin
Wujin
Changzhou, Jiangsu 213101 / CN
[2016/43]
Inventor(s)01 / XIAO, Zhiyuan
Beier Industrial Park
No.999 Chaoyang Road
Henglin
Changzhou Jiangsu 213101 / CN
 [2016/43]
Representative(s)Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP
Redcliff Quay
120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/43]Brown, David Leslie
Haseltine Lake LLP
Redcliff Quay
120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
Application number, filing date14872742.304.04.2014
[2016/43]
WO2014CN74799
Priority number, dateCN20131069923419.12.2013         Original published format: CN201310699234
[2016/43]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015089957
Date:25.06.2015
Language:ZH
[2015/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3085853
Date:26.10.2016
Language:EN
[2016/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN25.06.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.07.2017
ClassificationInternational:E04F15/10, C09J153/02, B32B7/12
[2017/32]
Former International [2016/43]E04F15/10
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/43]
TitleGerman:SELBSTKLEBENDE PVC-BODENPLATTE MIT WASSERDICHTEM KLEBSTOFF[2016/43]
English:PVC SELF-ADHESIVE FLOORBOARD WITH WATER-RESISTANT GLUE[2016/43]
French:LAME DE PLANCHER AUTO-ADHÉSIVE EN PVC COMPRENANT DE LA COLLE RÉSISTANT À L'EAU[2016/43]
Entry into regional phase15.06.2016Translation filed 
15.06.2016National basic fee paid 
15.06.2016Search fee paid 
15.06.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
15.06.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.06.2016Examination requested  [2016/43]
31.01.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.10.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.02.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
26.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
29.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[Y]US4284681  (TIDMARSH JAMES N ET AL) [Y] 1-5 * col 2, lines 43-54;; claim - *;
 [Y]EP0447855  (NAT STARCH CHEM INVEST [US]) [Y] 1-5 * example 1; claim - *;
 [Y]CN103410296  (CHEN B) [Y] 5 * figure - *;
 US2016251862  [ ] (CHEN BENYUAN [CN]) [ ] * paragraphs [0020] - [0022]; figure 1 *
International search[X]CN103097130  (HISAMITSU PHARMACEUTICAL CO., INC. ET AL.);
 [A]US2007071988  (BOTROS M.G.);
 [A]CN101864259  (GUANGZHOU HAOTE BONDING MATERIAL CO., LTD.)