Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3087640

EP3087640 - A CONNECTOR HAVING AN INNER CONDUCTOR ENGAGER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  29.06.2018
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip30.12.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PPC Broadband, Inc.
6176 East Molloy Road
East Syracuse, NY 13057 / US
[2016/44]
Inventor(s)01 / TREMBA, Timothy N.
6274 Morrell Road
Cayuta, NY 14824 / US
02 / WATKINS, Harold J.
1227 Salt Springs Road
Chittenango, NY 13037 / US
 [2016/44]
Representative(s)Sutto, Luca , et al
PGA S.P.A., Milano
Succursale di Lugano
Via Castagnola, 21c
6900 Lugano / CH
[N/P]
Former [2016/44]Sutto, Luca
PGA S.r.l.
Via Mascheroni, 31
20145 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date14873501.222.12.2014
[2016/44]
WO2014US71867
Priority number, dateUS201361920562P24.12.2013         Original published format: US 201361920562 P
[2016/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015100229
Date:02.07.2015
Language:EN
[2015/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3087640
Date:02.11.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.2015
[2016/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US02.07.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.06.2017
ClassificationInternational:H01R9/05, H01R9/053, // H01R13/52
[2017/28]
Former International [2016/44]H01R9/05, H01R9/053
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/44]
TitleGerman:STECKVERBINDER MIT EINEM INNENLEITEREINRASTER[2016/44]
English:A CONNECTOR HAVING AN INNER CONDUCTOR ENGAGER[2016/44]
French:CONNECTEUR À ÉLÉMENT D'ENGAGEMENT DE CONDUCTEUR INTERNE[2016/44]
Entry into regional phase22.07.2016National basic fee paid 
22.07.2016Search fee paid 
22.07.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
22.07.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.07.2016Examination requested  [2016/44]
08.01.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.01.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.09.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
31.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
27.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]US7189114  (BURRIS DONALD ANDREW [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [X]GB2077053  (BUNKER RAMO) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2008045080  (COOK CHRISTOPHER J [US]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *
International search[X]US7736180  (PAYNTER);
 [Y]US2012171894  (MALLOY ET AL.);
 [A]US2013012062  (NUGENT)