EP3076612 - PACKET PROCESSING METHODS AND NODES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/40] | PACKET PROCESSING METHOD, NODE AND SYSTEM | ||
[2017/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.2019 Database last updated on 19.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2018/12] |
Former [2017/02] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | ||
Former [2016/40] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Lin Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
SUN, Dayu Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
LIANG, Shujian Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2016/40] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2016/40] | Application number, filing date | 14874011.1 | 10.09.2014 | [2016/40] | WO2014CN86194 | Priority number, date | CN201310722660 | 24.12.2013 Original published format: CN201310722660 | [2016/40] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015096513 | Date: | 02.07.2015 | Language: | ZH | [2015/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3076612 | Date: | 05.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3076612 | Date: | 21.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.07.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/723, H04L12/801 | [2016/50] | CPC: |
H04L12/10 (EP,US);
H04L41/5054 (EP,US);
H04L43/028 (EP,US);
H04L45/306 (US);
H04L45/38 (US);
H04L45/42 (US);
H04L45/745 (EP,US);
H04L47/10 (EP,US);
H04L47/12 (US);
|
Former IPC [2016/40] | H04L12/723 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PAKETVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND -KNOTEN | [2017/43] | English: | PACKET PROCESSING METHODS AND NODES | [2017/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE PAQUETS ET NOEUDS | [2017/42] |
Former [2016/40] | PAKETVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN, -KNOTEN UND -SYSTEM | ||
Former [2016/40] | PACKET PROCESSING METHOD, NODE AND SYSTEM | ||
Former [2016/40] | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE PAQUET, NOEUD ET SYSTÈME | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2016 | Translation filed | 29.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2016 | Search fee paid | 29.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/40] | 04.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.09.2014 | AL | 21.03.2018 | AT | 21.03.2018 | CY | 21.03.2018 | CZ | 21.03.2018 | DK | 21.03.2018 | EE | 21.03.2018 | ES | 21.03.2018 | FI | 21.03.2018 | HR | 21.03.2018 | IT | 21.03.2018 | LT | 21.03.2018 | LV | 21.03.2018 | MC | 21.03.2018 | MK | 21.03.2018 | NL | 21.03.2018 | PL | 21.03.2018 | RO | 21.03.2018 | RS | 21.03.2018 | SE | 21.03.2018 | SI | 21.03.2018 | SK | 21.03.2018 | SM | 21.03.2018 | TR | 21.03.2018 | BG | 21.06.2018 | NO | 21.06.2018 | GR | 22.06.2018 | IS | 21.07.2018 | PT | 23.07.2018 | IE | 10.09.2018 | LU | 10.09.2018 | MT | 10.09.2018 | BE | 30.09.2018 | CH | 30.09.2018 | LI | 30.09.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 10.09.2014 | |
AL | 21.03.2018 | ||
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
MK | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
TR | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
IE | 10.09.2018 | ||
LU | 10.09.2018 | ||
MT | 10.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 10.09.2014 | |
AL | 21.03.2018 | ||
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
TR | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
IE | 10.09.2018 | ||
LU | 10.09.2018 | ||
MT | 10.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
TR | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
IE | 10.09.2018 | ||
LU | 10.09.2018 | ||
MT | 10.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
IE | 10.09.2018 | ||
LU | 10.09.2018 | ||
MT | 10.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
IE | 10.09.2018 | ||
LU | 10.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
IE | 10.09.2018 | ||
LU | 10.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
IE | 10.09.2018 | ||
LU | 10.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
LU | 10.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
ES | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | CY | 21.03.2018 | |
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 21.03.2018 | |
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 21.03.2018 | |
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 21.03.2018 | |
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2006092921 (NARAYANAN RAJESH [US], et al); | [I]US2011317701 (YAMATO JUNICHI [JP], et al); | [A]US2012093158 (CHIBA YASUNOBU [JP]); | [A]WO2012144194 (NEC CORP [JP], et al) | International search | [A]EP1164754 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); | [X]CN1906902 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) |