Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3087812

EP3087812 - SUPPORT STRUCTURES FOR AN ATTACHABLE, TWO-DIMENSIONAL FLEXIBLE ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.03.2019
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.08.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Flexterra, Inc.
8025 Lamon Avenue, Suite 043
Skokie, IL 60077 / US
[2017/42]
Former [2016/44]For all designated states
Polyera Corporation
8045 Lamon Avenue Suite 140
Skokie, IL 60077 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HUITEMA, Hjalmar Edzer Ayco
695 Minna Street
San Francisco, CA 94103 / US
02 / INAGAKI, Philippe
8045 Lamon Avenue
Suite 140
Skokie, IL 60077 / US
 [2016/44]
Representative(s)Lawrie, Donald James
Lawrie IP Limited
310 St Vincent Street
Glasgow G2 5RG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/44]Lawrie, Donald James
Lawrie IP Limited The Hub
Pacific Quay
Pacific Drive
Glasgow G51 1EA / GB
Application number, filing date14874426.123.12.2014
[2016/44]
WO2014US72172
Priority number, dateUS201361920705P24.12.2013         Original published format: US 201361920705 P
US201461969531P24.03.2014         Original published format: US 201461969531 P
US201461979668P15.04.2014         Original published format: US 201461979668 P
US201462003549P28.05.2014         Original published format: US 201462003549 P
US201462006714P02.06.2014         Original published format: US 201462006714 P
US201462089115P08.12.2014         Original published format: US 201462089115 P
[2016/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015100333
Date:02.07.2015
Language:EN
[2015/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3087812
Date:02.11.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.2015
[2016/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US02.07.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.08.2017
ClassificationInternational:H05K1/02, G09F9/30, G09F21/02
[2017/37]
Former International [2016/44]H05K1/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/44]
TitleGerman:STÜTZSTRUKTUREN FÜR ANSCHLIESSBARE, ZWEIDIMENSIONALE FLEXIBLE ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG[2016/44]
English:SUPPORT STRUCTURES FOR AN ATTACHABLE, TWO-DIMENSIONAL FLEXIBLE ELECTRONIC DEVICE[2016/44]
French:STRUCTURES DE SUPPORT POUR UN DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE FLEXIBLE BIDIMENSIONNEL AMOVIBLE[2016/44]
Entry into regional phase22.07.2016National basic fee paid 
22.07.2016Search fee paid 
22.07.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
22.07.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.07.2016Examination requested  [2016/44]
05.03.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.03.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.08.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
31.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XAYI]US2006055691  (BURSETT JEFFREY M [US]) [X] 1-6,12,14 * paragraphs [0001] , [0059] , [0061] * * figures 1A-9E * [A] 8 [Y] 9-11 [I] 7,13,15;
 [XAI]US2008212271  (MISAWA ATSUSHI [JP]) [X] 1-3,5-8,12,14,15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0125] - [0127] * * figures 1-53B * [A] 4,9-11 [I] 13;
 [XA]US2013145522  (DA SILVA JOHN JACOB [CA]) [X] 1-8,12,14 * paragraphs [0002] , [0029] , [0034] - [0036] * * figures 1-10 * [A] 9-11,13,15;
 [YA]KR20110008118U  (JEONG-SEOK WOO) [Y] 9-11 * abstract * [A] 1-8,12-15
International search[X]US7787097  (SATOH TASUKU [JP]);
 [Y]US2009219225  (COPE RICHARD C [US]);
 [Y]US6577496  (GIOSCIA RICH [US], et al);
 [A]US2011048619  (MEINDERS ERWIN RINALDO [NL], et al);
 [A]US2006204675  (GAO ZHANJUN [US], et al)