blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3089706 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3089706



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 169
26.02.2019 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
13.02.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.02.2019 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 1
13.02.2019 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 2
13.02.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
08.02.2019 Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them Search / examination 2
14.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.01.2019 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 1
14.01.2019 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
14.01.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
14.01.2019 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 1
26.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
26.02.2018 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
26.02.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
26.02.2018 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 13
26.02.2018 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 13
26.02.2018 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
26.02.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.02.2018 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
01.02.2018 Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order Search / examination 1
29.01.2018 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 1
25.01.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.01.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.01.2018 General authorisation Search / examination 2
25.01.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.01.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.01.2018 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
25.01.2018 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
16.08.2017 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
28.07.2017 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
28.07.2017 European search opinion Search / examination 3
28.07.2017 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
28.07.2017 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
19.07.2017 Search started Search / examination 1
12.10.2016 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
12.08.2016 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
18.07.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
18.07.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
18.07.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
18.07.2016 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
18.07.2016 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
18.07.2016 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
13.05.2016 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
28.07.2015 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 33
09.07.2015 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
09.07.2015 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 35