blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3089706


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
22.02.2019 Change - inventor
22.02.2019 Change - applicant published on  27.03.2019  [2019/13]
22.02.2019 Change - inventor published on  27.03.2019  [2019/13]
30.10.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.03.2018 Amendment by applicant
31.01.2018 Change - representative
12.01.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.07.2017 Supplementary search report published on  30.08.2017  [2017/35]
28.07.2017 Change - classification published on  30.08.2017  [2017/35]
10.03.2017 Change - extension states published on  12.04.2017  [2017/15]
13.01.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.10.2016 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  09.11.2016  [2016/45]
07.10.2016 Request for examination filed published on  09.11.2016  [2016/45]
12.08.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
05.08.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
19.07.2016 Amendment by applicant
18.07.2016 Change - representative
18.07.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
21.07.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
10.07.2015 PCT data prior to European publication