blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3089706
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2016317289Global Dossier 03.11.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201415109437 31.12.2014
US201461923319 03.01.2014
WO2014US73084 31.12.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3089706Global Dossier 30.08.2017A4
EP3089706 09.11.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201461923319 03.01.2014
WO2014US73084 31.12.2014
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2015103434Global Dossier 09.07.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201461923319 03.01.2014