Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3089706

EP3089706 - APPARATUS AND METHOD TO RESHAPE GEOMETRY OF DISEASED HEART VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  07.10.2016
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.02.2019Change - inventor 
22.02.2019Change - applicantpublished on 27.03.2019  [2019/13]
22.02.2019Change - inventorpublished on 27.03.2019  [2019/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mitral Technologies
Quai Banning 6
4000 Liège / BE
[2019/13]
Former [2016/45]For all designated states
Tozzi, Luigi, P.
1019 Fossil Creek Parkway
Fort Collins, CO 80525 / US
Inventor(s)01 / TOZZI, Luigi P.
1019 Fossil Creek Parkway
Fort Collins, CO 80525 / US
 [2019/13]
Former [2016/45]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Pecher, Nicolas
Pecher & Partners
Rue Louis de Geer, 6
1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE
[N/P]
Former [2016/45]Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1
20355 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date14875934.331.12.2014
[2016/45]
WO2014US73084
Priority number, dateUS201461923319P03.01.2014         Original published format: US 201461923319 P
[2016/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015103434
Date:09.07.2015
Language:EN
[2015/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3089706
Date:09.11.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.2015
[2016/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US09.07.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.07.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/24
[2016/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/45]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR UMFORMUNG DER GEOMETRIE EINER ERKRANKTEN HERZKLAPPE[2016/45]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD TO RESHAPE GEOMETRY OF DISEASED HEART VALVE[2016/45]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR REMODELER LA GÉOMÉTRIE D'UNE VALVE CARDIAQUE MALADE[2016/45]
Entry into regional phase03.08.2016National basic fee paid 
03.08.2016Search fee paid 
03.08.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
03.08.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.08.2016Examination requested  [2016/45]
26.02.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
26.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]US2006020336  (LIDDICOAT JOHN R [US]) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0133] - [0141]; figures 34-55 *;
 [X]US2008195126  (SOLEM JAN OTTO [CH]) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0072]; figure 10B *;
 [X]US2005222488  (CHANG ROBERT T [US] ET AL) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0129] , [ 132] - [0160]; figures 1-73 *;
 [A]US2010016655  (ANNEST LON S [US] ET AL) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *
International search[X]US2005004668  (AKLOG ET AL);
 [A]US2010222876  (HYDE);
 [A]US2006252984  (RAHDERT ET AL.)
by applicantUS2006020336
 US2008195126
 US2005222488